Asphaltos Trade, S.A v. Bituven Puerto Rico, LLC

Plaintiff: Asphaltos Trade, S.A
Defendant: Bituven Puerto Rico, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01876
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to allow Jorge D. Guttman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6212355) filed by Manuel Fernandez-Bared on behalf of Bituven Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 1/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Bared, Manuel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time until February 8, 2019 to File Complaint filed by Nayda I. Perez-Roman on behalf of Bituven Puerto Rico, LLC. Responses due by 1/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Roman, Nayda) Modified docket text on 1/9/2019 (idg).
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Asphaltos Trade, S.A upon Bituven Puerto Rico, LLC served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (Arroyo-Portela, Lourdes)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bituven Puerto Rico, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Bituven Puerto Rico, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6149401.), filed by Asphaltos Trade, S.A. Service due by 2/13/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Category Sheet, #12 Summons)(Arroyo-Portela, Lourdes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asphaltos Trade, S.A v. Bituven Puerto Rico, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asphaltos Trade, S.A
Represented By: Lourdes Arlene Arroyo-Portela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bituven Puerto Rico, LLC
Represented By: Linette Figueroa-Torres
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Represented By: Nayda I. Perez-Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?