Ortiz et al v. Evangelica, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ruth Adorno, Reverend Angel L. Ortiz and Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Adorno
Defendant: Samaria Iglesia Evangelica, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01877
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 12/05/2018 by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Mayoral-Morales, Rafael)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting as requested #9 Motion for Extension of Time until January 24, 2019 to File Answer re: #3 Complaint filed by Angel L. Ortiz filed by Samaria Iglesia Evangelica, Inc. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/26/2018. (LE)
December 24, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 24, 2019 to File Answer re: #3 Complaint filed by Angel L. Ortiz filed by Victor J. Casal-Vazquez on behalf of Samaria Iglesia Evangelica, Inc. Responses due by 1/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Casal-Vazquez, Victor)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #5 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/29/2018. (LE)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Samaria Iglesia Evangelica, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (rim)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Rafael Mayoral-Morales on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Mayoral-Morales, Rafael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Angel L. Ortiz. Service due by 2/14/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Circular letters and Resolutions, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayoral-Morales, Rafael)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). (arg)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR-SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT AT DOCKET #3***COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6149176.), filed by Angel L. Ortiz. Service due by 2/13/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Circular letters and Resolution)(Mayoral-Morales, Rafael) Modified on 11/20/2018 (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz et al v. Evangelica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Adorno
Represented By: Rafael Mayoral-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverend Angel L. Ortiz
Represented By: Rafael Mayoral-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Adorno
Represented By: Rafael Mayoral-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samaria Iglesia Evangelica, Inc.
Represented By: Victor J. Casal-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?