Perez-Cortes v. Mobile Store Operators PR, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Nelson A Perez and Nelson A Perez-Cortes
Defendant: XYZ Corporation, Mobile Store Operators PR, LLC, Insurance Company ABC, John Doe and Mobile Store Operators, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01879
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet e: #1 Complaint (Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis) Modified on 12/4/2018 to add docket text and create relationship w/dkt. 1 (ab).
November 30, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #4 Notice of Filing Exhibits. Incomplete PDF, Counsel to refile completed PDF. (mg)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR Incomplete PDF, Counsel to re-file completed PDF.*** NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Nelson A Perez (Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis) Modified on 11/30/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mobile Store Operators PR, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6149664.), filed by Nelson A Perez. Service due by 2/13/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Cortes v. Mobile Store Operators PR, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Store Operators PR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Store Operators, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson A Perez
Represented By: Amexis J. Bonilla-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson A Perez-Cortes
Represented By: Amexis J. Bonilla-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?