Naranjo-Rosado v. USA
Petitioner: Leonel Naranjo-Rosario
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2018cv01882
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Government is to submit its Response to Motion to Vacate and the memorandum thereof by January 15, 2019. See Dkt. Nos. #1 and #4 . Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/29/2018. (EA)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion requesting Order. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/29/2018. (EA)
November 29, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re #3 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR as per Counsels request. Document was re-filed in D.E. #6.*** (mcm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael F. Castro-Lang on behalf of Leonel Naranjo-Rosario (Castro-Lang, Rafael)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION requesting Order for Conventional Filing filed by Rafael F. Castro-Lang on behalf of Leonel Naranjo-Rosario Responses due by 12/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Castro-Lang, Rafael)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of 2255 Petition filed by Leonel Naranjo-Rosario filed by Leonel Naranjo-Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Castro-Lang, Rafael)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael F. Castro-Lang on behalf of Leonel Naranjo-Rosario (Castro-Lang, Rafael) Modified on 11/29/2018 (mcm).
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 document) (ab)(Original documents sent by mail to Atty Rafael Castro-Lang)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 12-cr-616-DRD) filed by Leonel Naranjo-Rosario, PRO SE. Responses due by 11/29/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (ab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naranjo-Rosado v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonel Naranjo-Rosario
Represented By: Rafael F. Castro-Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?