Borrero et al v. QBE Seguros

Plaintiff: Hector Emanuel Borrero and Noelia Sanchez
Defendant: QBE Seguros
Case Number: 3:2018cv01888
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 JUDGMENT. The case is HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2018.(sr)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Hector Emanuel Borrero, QBE Seguros, Noelia Sanchez. Voluntary dismissal with prejudice is Granted. Clerk of Court is to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/12/2018.(wm)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Joint NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by All Parties (Quinones-Suarez, Pedro) Modified on 12/7/2018 to add filers (rom).
November 30, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 29, 2018 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by QBE Seguros. ***FILED IN ERROR. Document was re-filed in D.E. #4 .*** (rom)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 29, 2018 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by QBE Seguros filed by Pedro Quinones-Suarez on behalf of QBE Seguros Responses due by 12/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Quinones-Suarez, Pedro) Modified on 11/30/2018 to edit docket text (rom).
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document was re-filed in D.E. #4 .*** MOTION for Extension of Time until December 29, 2018 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by QBE Seguros filed by Pedro Quinones-Suarez on behalf of QBE Seguros Responses due by 12/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Quinones-Suarez, Pedro) Modified on 11/30/2018 (rom).
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Juan Superor Court, case number SJ18cv07759. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6151669), filed by QBE Seguros. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Translated Service of Summons and Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons and Amended Complaint in Spanish Language, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Amended Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet)(Quinones-Suarez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borrero et al v. QBE Seguros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Seguros
Represented By: Pedro Quinones-Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Emanuel Borrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelia Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?