United States of America v. Rosa-Cartagena
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Felix Rosa-Cartagena
Case Number: 3:2018cv01908
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Signed by Judge William G. Young on 12/11/2018. (EES)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND JUDGMENT Signed by Judge William G. Young on 12/10/2018.(EES)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Jorge L. Matos on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 12/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order and Judgment)(Matos, Jorge)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 STIPULATION for Consent Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order and Judgment) (Matos, Jorge)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Consent Judgment against Felix Rosa-Cartagena, filed by United States of America. Service due by 2/26/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Matos, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rosa-Cartagena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Rosa-Cartagena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jorge L. Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?