White et al v. Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michele White, Ashley White, Conjugal Community William and Michele White and William White
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1" to "JOHN DOE 50", Maximo Solar Industries, Inc., JOHN DOE 51" to "JOHN DOE 100", Maximo Solar Group, Corp., John Doe 51 to John Doe 100, John Doe 1 to John Doe 50 and David Roldan
Case Number: 3:2018cv01913
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Referring Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Extension of Time. Translations due by 2/17/2022. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 01/19/2022. (MRB)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STATEMENT Supporting Statement of Uncontested Facts filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. re: #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Motion to Preclude Expert Witness Report and Testimony and for Summary Judgment) MOTION in Limine filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OGPE Certification, #2 Exhibit E. Ayala Unsworn Statement Under Penalty of Perjury, #3 Exhibit PREPA Certification, #4 Exhibit PREPA Letter Nov -7 - 2016, #5 Exhibit Kimberlain Deposition, #6 Exhibit CDT Records, #7 Exhibit Berlin CV, #8 Exhibit Technical Report Revised, #9 Exhibit Technical Report Two, #10 Exhibit Rebuttal Report, #11 Exhibit Excerpts E. Ayala Deposition) (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Motion to Preclude Expert Witness Report and Testimony and for Summary Judgment) ( Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 2/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.), MOTION in Limine ( Responses due by 2/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.) filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/17/2022 to file Certified English Translations filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 2/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2022. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 01/13/2022. (MRB)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Final MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/18/2022 to file Motion in Limine and for Summary Judgment(Urgent) filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 1/27/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #108 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2022. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 12/15/2021. (MCV)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Final MOTION for Extension of Time until January 14, 2022 to file Dispositive Motions filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 12/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Email of 11-5-21, #2 Exhibit 2-Email of 11-11-21, #3 Exhibit 3-EmaI of 11-12-21, #4 Exhibit 4-Email of 11-22-21, #5 Exhibit 5-Email of 11-22-21, #6 Exhibit 6-Email of 11-22-21, #7 Exhibit 7-Email of 11-23-21)(Vivas, Jose)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2021. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 10/7/2021. (MCV)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after recent deposition transcripts are notified to file Dispositive Motions filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 10/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivas, Jose)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Extension of Time to File. However, because October 30, 2021 falls on a Saturday, dispositive motions are due on or before November 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 08/30/2021. (MRB)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 30, 2021. to file Dispositive Motions filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 9/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivas, Jose)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: Motion Hearing re #101 MOTION is set for 8/17/2021 at 2:30 PM by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll. During the VTC all participants will connect remotely. Further instructions with the information to connect will follow by email. Joint motion to continue shall include three alternative dates in which all parties are available. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 8/16/2021. (ram)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION for Protective Order (Urgent) filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 8/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4)(Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION for extension of time until August 11, 2021 to Produce Expert Rebuttal filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Expert Report due by July 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 07/08/2021. (MRB)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 20, 2021 to file Expert Report filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 7/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vivas, Jose)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Reconsideration. The extension of time is granted. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 6/28/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Reconsideration re 95 Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 7/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 95 ) (Vivas, Jose)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER finding as moot #92 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 6/28/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 6/28/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for extension of time filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 7/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivas, Jose)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for extension of time filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 7/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivas, Jose)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll: Telephone Conference held on 8/25/2020. Present on behalf of plaintiffs was Atty. Jorge Carazo-Quetglas. On behalf of defendants Atty. Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez, Atty. Jose H. Vivas, Atty. Ruben T. Nigaglioni and Atty. Antonio Bauza-Torres. Noted #84 Motion In Compliance; granting #87 Motion requesting Order, separate orders to be issued; granting #89 Motion for extension of time. Discovery Deadline extended until August 31, 2020. Hearing set for 10:00. Hearing held at 10:05. Hearing ended at 10:34. (ram)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER holding in abeyance #89 Motion for extension of time pending status conference of 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 08/18/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Joint MOTION for extension of time until August 30, 2021 to to Conclude All Discovery filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs, Maximo Solar Industries, Inc., David Roldan. Responses due by 9/1/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge) Modified on 8/19/2020 to add filers (rom).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: A Telephone/Status Conference is set for 8/25/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll. The Courtroom Deputy will send an e-mail to the parties with the call in number. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 8/17/2020. (ram)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION requesting Order for Medical Records filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 8/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Centro Patillas, #2 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Baskin, #3 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Cranston, #4 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Nadal, #5 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Camden, #6 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Martinez, #7 Text of Proposed Order Dr. San Miguel, #8 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Sosa, #9 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Cox, #10 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Bermudez, #11 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Gomez, #12 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Alvarado, #13 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Santiago, #14 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Nido, #15 Text of Proposed Order Dr. Wamer, #16 Text of Proposed Order Dr. David, #17 Text of Proposed Order Hospital Menonita Guayama)(Vivas, Jose)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of newly appointed U.S. District Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 04/07/2020. (gr)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: Denying without prejudice #77 "Motion to Consolidate Cases." The court notes that the motion to consolidate filed in the main case (Civil No. 18-1068 (ADC), Docket No. 43) was denied without prejudice (Docket No. 84). Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/9/2020. (MPL)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Motion In Compliance Submtting JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULE as to #83 Order filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs, Maximo Solar Industries, Inc., David Roldan. Responses due by 3/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #83 ) (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge) Modified on 3/9/2020 to add filers (rom).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: See attached. Joint Proposed Schedule due not later than March 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/25/2020. (MPL)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, First Amended filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Defendant Maximo Solar Industries, Inc..(Vivas, Jose)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint filed by Antonio Bauza-Torres on behalf of Defendant David Roldn.(Bauza-Torres, Antonio)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER: The Opinion and Order at Docket No. 79 is amended nunc pro tunc, to include the following sentence in the beginning of the first paragraph of Section II, Subsection A: "Maximo Group claims the action is time-barred (Docket No. 32, p. 4)." Revised Opinion and Order attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/14/2020. (MPL)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 OPINION AND ORDER: See attached. Maximo Group's "Motion to Dismiss" at Docket No. 32 is GRANTED and Maximo Solar's and David Roldan's "Motions to Dismiss" at Docket Nos. 36, 58, and 63 are DENIED. They shall answer the complaint not later than February 25, 2020.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/11/2020.(LMR)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #78 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply To Response in Oppostion to Motion for Reconsideraction. ***FILED IN ERROR-WRONG ENTRY*** (mr)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ***FILED IN ERROR-WRONG ENTRY*** MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply To Response in Oppostion to Motion for Reconsideraction filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REPLY)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge) Modified on 1/9/2020 (mr).
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to consolidate cases by Sunnova Energy Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 10/15/2019 as to event (mr).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: Noting #75 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/13/2019. (EMJ)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Motion for Protective Order to Quash Deposition to Maximo Solar Industries in Parallel Litigation filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 9/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivas, Jose)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Noting #73 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/2/2019. (EMJ)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Vacation of Plaintiffs' Attorney filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UPON WHICH RELIEF MAY BE GRANTED AND FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by David Roldn filed by All Plaintiffs. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Finding as moot #61 "Motion for Extension of Time." The court notes that the response was submitted at Docket No. #65 . Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/17/2019.(EMJ)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: Granting #62 & #66 "Motion for Leave to File Surreply." The surreply shall be electronically filed forthwith. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/17/2019.(EMJ)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (Docket No. 67), this case has been transferred back to the docket of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Signed by Clerk on 06/17/2019. (gr)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER OF RECUSAL: This United States District Judge disqualifies himself from any further proceeding in this case. Title 28, U.S.C. 455(b)(2). The matter is referred to the Clerk's Office to transfer this case back to the docket of U.S. District Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez in exchange for another case from his docket. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 06/17/2019.(dv)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Motions terminated: #57 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition to MSI's Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/31/2019 to File Response/Reply as to #55 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Community William and Michele White filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc.. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/17/2019.(EMJ)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Second MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-reply to Maximo's Reply filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-reply, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs'Statement)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #58 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Lack of Subject - Matter Jurisdiction as to David Roldn filed by David Roldn filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit 5 to Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit 6 to Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit 7 to Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit 8 to Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of newly appointed U.S. District Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 06/13/2019. (gr)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim upon which relief may be granted and for insufficient service of process filed by Antonio Bauza-Torres on behalf of David Roldn Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza-Torres, Antonio)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-reply filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #58 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Lack of Subject - Matter Jurisdiction as to David Roldn filed by David Roldn filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #58 ) (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Re: #57 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition to MSI's Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/31/2019 to File Response/Reply as to #55 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Community William and Michele White, #36 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc.. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)Modified on 6/3/2019 to add docket relationship (mcm).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Granting #57 "Motion for Leave to Reply to Opposition to MTD and for Extension of Time." Reply due not later than May 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/29/2019.(EMJ)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Lack of Subject - Matter Jurisdiction as to David Roldan filed by Antonio Bauza-Torres on behalf of David Roldn Responses due by 6/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza-Torres, Antonio)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition to MSI's Motion to Dismiss, MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/31/2019 to File Response/Reply as to #55 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Community William and Michele White filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 6/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #55 ) (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Maximo Solar Group, Corp. Re: #51 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) and MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/21/2019 to File Response/Reply as to #44 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Community William and Michele White filed by Maximo Solar Group, Corp. filed by Maximo Solar Group, Corp.. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Statement under Penalty of Perjury, #2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit 5 to Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit 6 to Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit 7 to Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit 8 to Exhibit A)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Granting #51 "Motion for Leave to Reply to Opposition to MTD and for Extension of Time." Reply due not later than May 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/15/2019.(EMJ)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: Granting #52 "Motion to Withdraw as Attorney." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/15/2019. (EMJ)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Jose R. Davila-Acevedo filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Maximo Solar Group, Corp. Responses due by 5/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) and, MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/21/2019 to File Response/Reply as to #44 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Community William and Michele White filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of Maximo Solar Group, Corp. Responses due by 5/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #44 ) (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Noting #49 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/13/2019. (ebb)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of Maximo Solar Group, Corp. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Noting #45 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/10/2019. (ebb)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Granting #46 "Motion For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead." The defendant, David Roldan, shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 5/24/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/10/2019. (ebb)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for extension of time until May 24, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Antonio Bauza-Torres on behalf of David Roldn Responses due by 5/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza-Torres, Antonio)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Antonio Bauza-Torres on behalf of David Roldn Responses due by 5/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza-Torres, Antonio)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction due to insufficient service of process as to All Plaintiffs filed by Maximo Solar Group, Corp. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement by Plaintiffs under Penalty of Perjury, #2 Exhibit Statement by Abimael Rodrguez under Penalty of Perjury)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Granting #42 "Motion for Extension of Time." Opposition due not later than May 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/6/2019.(EMJ)
May 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 21, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #36 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Denying #38 "Motion Requesting Court Orders." Defendant does not explain why court intervention is warranted and it may not obtain the records from plaintiff. In the event that court intervention is necessary, defendant may refile the motion specifying the persons at the "CDT" of Patillas, the Mennonite Hospital of Guayama, and the Office of Emergency Medical Management of Guayama to whom the order should be addressed. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/30/2019. (EMJ)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Noting #39 "Motion Submitting Certified Translations." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/29/2019.(EMJ)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation re: #33 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/29/2019 to file translation filed by Maximo Solar Group, Corp. filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Maximo Solar Group, Corp. Responses due by 5/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Translation of Extrajudicial Claim Letter)(Related document(s) #33 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION requesting Order filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 5/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order CDT Patillas, #2 Text of Proposed Order Emergency Management, #3 Text of Proposed Order HGM Guayama)(Vivas, Jose)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Granting #35 "Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition...." Response due not later than May 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/22/2019. (EMJ)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 5/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 8, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction due to insufficient service of process as to All Plaintiffs filed by Maximo Solar Group, Corp. filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #32 ) (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Granting #33 "Motion for Leave to File Spanish-Language Documents and For Extension of Time to File Translation." Certified translations due not later than April 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/10/2019.(EMJ)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/29/2019 to file translation filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Maximo Solar Group, Corp. Responses due by 4/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction due to insufficient service of process as to All Plaintiffs filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Maximo Solar Group, Corp. Responses due by 4/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit extrajudicial claim letter, #2 Exhibit Efrain Ayala's unsworn statement under penalty of perjury)(Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Granting #30 "Motion to Clarify Maximo Group's Motion...." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than April 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/5/2019. (EMJ)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Clarify ECF No. 26, MOTION for extension of time until 4/9/2019 to File a Responsive Pleading filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Maximo Solar Group, Corp. Responses due by 4/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Summons Issued as to David Roldan. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Granting #26 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than April 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/27/2019.(EMJ)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Granting #24 "Motion Requesting Extension of Time to Plead." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than April 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/26/2019. (EMJ)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/9/2019 to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #21 Amended Complaint filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Community William and Michele White, #23 Summons Returned Executed filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Community William and Michele White filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Maximo Solar Group, Corp. Responses due by 4/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #21 , #23 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Maximo Solar Group, Corp. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for extension of time filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 4/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivas, Jose)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed Maximo Solar Group, Corp. by All Plaintiffs upon (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. by All Plaintiffs upon (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Roldn, filed by Ashley White, Conjugal Community William and Michele White, William White, Michele White. (Attachments: #1 Summons David Roldn)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting #19 "Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint." The amended complaint shall be electronically filed forthwith. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/5/2019. (EMJ)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Compalint filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Maximo Solar Group, Corp., Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re 16 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting in part and Denying in part #8 "Motion to Dismiss for Want of Personal Jurisdiction." Having considered the parties' respective positions regarding the motion to dismiss, the court agrees with Maximo Solar Industries, Inc that service of process was insufficient. The court, however, will not dismiss the case without prejudice as defendant requests. Considering that (i) the term to serve process in this case has not expired; (ii) the case is in its early stages (the complaint was filed on November 29, 2018); and (iii) there is no prejudice to defendant, the court will allow plaintiffs until March 26, 2019 to properly serve process upon Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/12/2019. (LMR)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss for Want of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to All Plaintiffs filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc., #13 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Reply to "Response in Opposition to 'Motion to Dismiss for Want of Personal Jurisdiction' and Request for Evidentiary Hearing," at ECF No. 11) filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc.. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #13 "Motion for Leave to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss." Defendant shall reply not later than January 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/24/2019. (EMJ)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Reply to "Response in Opposition to 'Motion to Dismiss for Want of Personal Jurisdiction' and Request for Evidentiary Hearing," at ECF No. 11) filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 2/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement byMaximo Solar Industries, Inc.. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
January 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismss filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to All Plaintiffs filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service MSI, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service MSG, #3 Exhibit C - Stataement under penalty of perjury, #4 Exhibit D - first email, #5 Exhibit E - second email)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
January 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Maximo Solar Group, Corp. served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
January 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to All Plaintiffs filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 1/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement under Penalty of Perjury)(Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead." Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead not later than January 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/27/2018. (AM)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time until 02/01/2019 to answer the complaint or otherwise plead filed by Ruben T. Nigaglioni on behalf of Maximo Solar Group, Corp., Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. Responses due by 1/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nigaglioni, Ruben)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Maximo Solar Group, Corp., Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of Conjugal Community William and Michele White, Ashley White, Michele White, William White (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE 1" to "JOHN DOE 50", JOHN DOE 51" to "JOHN DOE 100", Maximo Solar Group, Corp., Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6163852.), filed by Ashley White, Conjugal Community William and Michele White, William White, Michele White. Service due by 2/27/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele White
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley White
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Community William and Michele White
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William White
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1" to "JOHN DOE 50"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximo Solar Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez
Represented By: Ruben T. Nigaglioni
Represented By: Jose H. Vivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 51" to "JOHN DOE 100"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximo Solar Group, Corp.
Represented By: Ruben T. Nigaglioni
Represented By: Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 51 to John Doe 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 to John Doe 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Roldan
Represented By: Antonio Bauza-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?