DISH Network L.L.C. et al v. Cottes

Plaintiff: NagraStar LLC and DISH Network L.L.C.
Defendant: Herbert Cottes
Case Number: 3:2018cv01922
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC upon Herbert Cottes served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Fontanez-Nieves, Juan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Herbert Cottes (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
December 4, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (ad)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Carlos Fontanez-Nieves on behalf of DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC (Fontanez-Nieves, Juan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement byNagraStar LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kudelski S.A. for NagraStar LLC.. (Torres-Pabon, Sonia)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byDISH Network L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation for DISH Network L.L.C... (Torres-Pabon, Sonia)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Herbert Cottes ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6168267.), filed by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC. Service due by 3/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Torres-Pabon, Sonia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISH Network L.L.C. et al v. Cottes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NagraStar LLC
Represented By: Sonia I. Torres-Pabon
Represented By: Juan Carlos Fontanez-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISH Network L.L.C.
Represented By: Sonia I. Torres-Pabon
Represented By: Juan Carlos Fontanez-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Cottes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?