DISH Network L.L.C. et al v. Garcia

Plaintiff: NagraStar LLC and DISH Network L.L.C.
Defendant: Ismael Garcia
Case Number: 3:2018cv01926
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC upon Ismael Garcia served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. (Fontanez-Nieves, Juan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ismael Garcia (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
December 4, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (ad) Modified on 12/20/2018 to edit docket text (gmm).
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Carlos Fontanez-Nieves on behalf of DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC (Fontanez-Nieves, Juan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement byNagraStar LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kudelski S.A. for NagraStar LLC.. (Torres-Pabon, Sonia)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byDISH Network L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Dish Network Corporation for DISH Network L.L.C... (Torres-Pabon, Sonia)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ismael Garcia ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6168500.), filed by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC. Service due by 3/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Ismael Garcia)(Torres-Pabon, Sonia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISH Network L.L.C. et al v. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NagraStar LLC
Represented By: Sonia I. Torres-Pabon
Represented By: Juan Carlos Fontanez-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISH Network L.L.C.
Represented By: Sonia I. Torres-Pabon
Represented By: Juan Carlos Fontanez-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismael Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?