Falcon et al v. Lopez-Galarza et al

Plaintiff: Yarelyz Falcon and Jancy Segarra
Defendant: SIMED, Doctors Center Hospital, Will Doe, ABC Corp., XYZ Insurance Company, ABC Insurance Company, Lourdes Lopez-Galarza, Glisette Rodriguez, Puerto Rico Medical Defense, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Doe, Dr. Glisette Rodriguez-Pena, John Doe, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Doe, Joe Doe and Dr. Lourdes Lopez-Galarza
Case Number: 3:2018cv01929
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for extension of time; granting #7 Motion for extension of time. SIMED, on behalf of Dr. Glisette Rodriguez, ECF No. 6, and on behalf of Dr. Lourdes Lopez Galarza, ECF No. 7, may file its answer by February 22, 2019. Dispositive motions will not be considered in lieu of an answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/25/2019. (wm) Modified on 1/28/2019 to edit docket text (rom).
January 23, 2019 7 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for extension of time until February 22, 2019 to ANSWER THE AMENDED COMPLAINT OR OTHERWISE PLEAD filed by Lizbeth Ramos-Collazo on behalf of SIMED Responses due by 2/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Collazo, Lizbeth) Modified on 1/24/2019 to edit event title (rom).
January 18, 2019 6 MOTION for extension of time until February 19, 2018 to Answer Complaint or otherwise plead filed by Alejandra M. Rivera-Ramirez on behalf of SIMED Responses due by 2/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ramirez, Alejandra)
December 13, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Doe, Doctors Center Hospital, Joe Doe, John Doe, Lourdes Lopez-Galarza, Puerto Rico Medical Defense, Glisette Rodriguez-Pena, SIMED (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 6, 2018 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yarelyz Falcon, Jancy Segarra.(Pirallo-Di Cristina, Michelle)
December 6, 2018 3 ***FILED IN ERROR***WRONG PARTIES***COUNSEL ADVISED TO REFILE*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yarelyz Falcon, Jancy Segarra.(Pirallo-Di Cristina, Michelle) Modified on 12/6/2018 to add *filed in error* (xi).
December 6, 2018 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
December 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6172611.), filed by Yarelyz Falcon, Jancy Segarra. Service due by 3/5/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons, #7 Summons Summons)(Pirallo-Di Cristina, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falcon et al v. Lopez-Galarza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMED
Represented By: Alejandra M. Rivera-Ramirez
Represented By: Lizbeth Ramos-Collazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctors Center Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lourdes Lopez-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glisette Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Medical Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Glisette Rodriguez-Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lourdes Lopez-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yarelyz Falcon
Represented By: Michelle Pirallo-Di Cristina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jancy Segarra
Represented By: Michelle Pirallo-Di Cristina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?