USA v. $26,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $26,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 3:2018cv01973
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Publication by USA (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Martorani-Dale, David)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(rom)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Warrant in Rem Issued to arrest/release property as to $26,000.00 in U.S. Currency. (Attachments: #1 Warrant in Rem) (ad)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/19/2018. (sc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. (vdm)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of USA. Responses due by 12/31/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martorani-Dale, David) Modified on 12/18/2018 to edit docket text (gmm).
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $26,000.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by USA . Service due by 3/18/2019, (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Martorani-Dale, David) Modified on 12/18/2018 to edit docket text (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $26,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $26,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?