Precision Instruments and Technology, Inc. v. Texas Instruments Inc.
Plaintiff: Precision Instruments and Technology,Inc. and Precision Instruments and Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Texas Instruments Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01977
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 30 JUDGMENT dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/01/2019. (brc)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #28 Motion for extension of time: DENIED. The parties have settled. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Any dispute about the settlement terms or its "logistical aspects" shall be decided among the parties or be the subject of a suit for breach of contract. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/01/2019. (brc)
April 1, 2019 Filing 28 Second MOTION for extension of time until April 23, 2019 to to inform on the execution of a settlement agreement and file the corresponding joint stipulation for dismissal filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. Responses due by 4/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #26 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED as a final extension. Because the parties have settled, the only document to be filed is a Stipulation of Dismissal. Stipulation of Dismissal deadline is April 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/19/2019. (brc)
March 18, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for extension of time until April 2, 2019 to inform of settlement agreement and file joint motion to dismiss filed by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. Responses due by 4/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File: GRANTED. Motion to dismiss due March 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/08/2019. (brc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 18, 2019 to file Motion to Dismiss due to Settlement filed by Gregory T. Usera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Usera, Gregory)
February 19, 2019 Filing 23 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition to #15 Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by Precision Instruments and Technology, Inc. (Agueros-Jimenez, Diego) Modified on 2/20/2019 to create relationship to docket #15(ab).
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 Motion for Leave to File: GRANTED. The sur-reply will be filed no later than February 19, 2019 and will strictly comply with Local Rule 7(c). Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/13/2019. (brc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Document Surreply filed by Gregory T. Usera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Usera, Gregory)
February 11, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Texas Instruments Inc. Re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to Compel Arbitration filed by Texas Instruments Inc. filed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Motion for Leave to File: GRANTED. The reply will be filed as a separate document no later than February 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/11/2019. (brc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration with Tendered Reply filed by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. Responses due by 2/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TENDERED REPLY)(Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by Precision Instruments and Technology, Inc. Re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to Compel Arbitration filed by Texas Instruments Inc. filed by Precision Instruments and Technology, Inc.. (Agueros-Jimenez, Diego)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #14 Motion for Leave to Appear: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/25/2019. (brc)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to Compel Arbitration filed by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. Responses due by 2/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Gregory T. Usera on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Usera, Gregory) Modified on 1/24/2019 to edit title (ab).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 1/25/2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/21/2018. (ct)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/25/19 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6 filed by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. Responses due by 1/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #5 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/20/2018. (grf)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #4 Motion for Leave to Appear : NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/20/2018. (grf)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (vdm)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement byTexas Instruments Inc.. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing: Civil Cover Sheet by Texas Instruments Inc. re #3 Notice of Defective Filing (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing: Category Sheet by Texas Instruments Inc. re #3 Notice of Defective Filing (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to allow Tynan (Ty) Buthod to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6193407) filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. Responses due by 1/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Diego Jose Agueros-Jimenez on behalf of Precision Instruments and Technology,Inc. Responses due by 1/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Agueros-Jimenez, Diego)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 12/20/2018. (rim)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6192246), filed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Garcia-Benitez, Carla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Instruments and Technology, Inc. v. Texas Instruments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Instruments Inc.
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz
Represented By: Ty Buthod
Represented By: Tynan Buthod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Instruments and Technology,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Instruments and Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Diego Jose Agueros-Jimenez
Represented By: Gregory T. Usera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?