Martinez-Crespo et al v. Lopez-Santiago et al

Plaintiff: Juan C. Martinez-Crespo
Defendant: Edgardo Acevedo, Adrian Cardoza-Cardoza, Carlos C. Feliciano-Perez, Miguel A. Rodriguez, Sgt. Carlos R. Santiago-Antonpietri, Edgardo Rios-Valentin, Juan L. Lopez-Santiago, Juan Jose Ortiz-Perez, Wilfredo Valentin-Ruiz, Carlos C. Feliciano and Sgt. Enrique Perez-De La Torre
Case Number: 3:2018cv01983
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Juan Jose Ortiz-Perez served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (gav)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 USM Return of Summons Unexecuted as to Miguel A. Rodriguez on 1/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons Miguel A. Rodriguez) (gav)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 USM Return of Summons Executed as to Adrian Cardoza-Cardoza on 1/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Adrian Cardoza-Cardoza) (gav)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 USM Return of Summons Unexecuted as to Carlos Santiago-Antonpietri on 1/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons Carlos R. Santiago-Antonpietri) (gav)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 USM Return of Summons Unexecuted as to Wilfredo Valentin-Ruiz on 1/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons Wilfredo Valentin-Ruiz) (gav)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 USM Return of Summons Unexecuted as to Edgardo Acevedo on 1/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Edgardo Acevedo) (gav)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 USM Return of Summons Unexecuted as to Carlos C. Feliciano on 1/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons Carlos C. Feliciano) (gav)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Edgardo Acevedo, Adrian Cardoza-Cardoza, Carlos C. Feliciano, Juan L. Lopez-Santiago, Juan Jose Ortiz-Perez, Enrique Perez-De La Torre, Edgardo Rios-Valentin, Miguel A. Rodriguez, Carlos R. Santiago-Antonpietri, Wilfredo Valentin-Ruiz through the US Marshals with copy of Order, copy of Complaint and USM 285 (ad)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #6 Summons Issued. ***FILED IN ERROR Document will be re-filed.*** (mcm)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Summons Issued as to Edgardo Acevedo, Adrian Cardoza-Cardoza, Carlos C. Feliciano-Perez, Juan L. Lopez-Santiago, Edgardo Rios-Valentin, Miguel A. Rodriguez, Carlos R. Santiago-Antonpietri through the US Marshals with copy of Order, copy of Complaint and USM 285 (ad) Modified on 1/8/2019 (mcm).
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Juan C. Martinez-Crespo. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/3/2019.(EES)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/2/2019. (EES)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Edgardo Acevedo, Adrian Cardoza-Cardoza, Carlos C. Feliciano-Perez, Juan L. Lopez-Santiago, Edgardo Rios-Valentin, Miguel A. Rodriguez, Carlos R. Santiago-Antonpietri, filed by Juan C. Martinez-Crespo, Pro Se. Service due by 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rim)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Juan C. Martinez-Crespo, Pro Se. (rim)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Juan C. Martinez-Crespo, Pro Se. Responses due by 1/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis)(rim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Crespo et al v. Lopez-Santiago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Cardoza-Cardoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos C. Feliciano-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Carlos R. Santiago-Antonpietri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Rios-Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan L. Lopez-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Jose Ortiz-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilfredo Valentin-Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos C. Feliciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Enrique Perez-De La Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C. Martinez-Crespo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?