The Government of Puerto Rico v. The Carpenter Company et al
Plaintiff: The Government of Puerto Rico
Defendant: Vitafoam Products Canada, Limited, David Carson, Otto Bock Polyurethane Technologies, Inc., The Carpenter Company, Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Flexible Foam Products, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Vitafoam, Inc., Scottdel, Inc., FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co., Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc. and Louis Carson
Case Number: 3:2018cv01987
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:25
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting as requested #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/14/2019. (LE)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/18/2019 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Respond re: #1 Complaint, filed by The Government of Puerto Rico filed by Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez on behalf of FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc., The Carpenter Company, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc. Responses due by 2/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Hernandez-Gonzalez, Arturo)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ***FILED IN ERROR***ORDER: Granting as requested #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/13/2019. (LE) Modified on 2/13/2019 (gmm).
February 12, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/18/2019 to File Answer to the Complaint filed by Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez on behalf of FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc., The Carpenter Company, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc. ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** (ab)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/18/2019 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Respond re: #1 Complaint, filed by The Government of Puerto Rico filed by Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez on behalf of FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc., The Carpenter Company, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc. Responses due by 2/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Hernandez-Gonzalez, Arturo) Modified on 2/13/2019 (ab).
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Leggett & Platt, Inc. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified on 2/13/2019 to edit title (gmm).
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Mohawk Industries, Inc. served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Proof of Service by All Plaintiffs upon Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Proof of Service Carpenter Company by All Plaintiffs upon The Carpenter Company served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Proof of Service by All Plaintiffs upon FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Government of Puerto Rico upon Vitafoam, Inc. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Mohawk Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(rom)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Louis Carson, David Carson, FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Flexible Foam Products, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc., Otto Bock Polyurethane Technologies, Inc., Scottdel, Inc., The Carpenter Company, Vitafoam Products Canada, Limited, Vitafoam, Inc., Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noted #4 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/21/2018. (LE)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. (rim)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6195681.), filed by The Government of Puerto Rico. Service due by 3/20/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons)(Maldonado-Rosa, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Government of Puerto Rico v. The Carpenter Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitafoam Products Canada, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otto Bock Polyurethane Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Carpenter Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohawk Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexible Foam Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Represented By: Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbridge Foam Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitafoam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottdel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Government of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Denise Maldonado-Rosa
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?