Seacape Shipping & Trading LLC v. Metalex 2000 S.A. and Alutrade S.A.

Plaintiff: Seacape Shipping & Trading LLC
Defendant: Metalex 2000 S.A. and Alutrade S.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01989
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 USM Return of Writ of Attachment and Garnishment Executed as to Arca Bank International, Inc. on 1/22/2019. (rom)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 Writ of ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT Issued. (Original and certified copy sent to Atty. Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales) (rim)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Warrant for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Rivera-Morales, Jose)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER noted #4 Supplemental Motion. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/14/2019. (wm)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Motion for Writ of Attachment. Granted. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/14/2019. (wm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Support of Order of Attachment re: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment filed by Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales on behalf of Seacape Shipping & Trading LLC Responses due by 1/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Rivera-Morales, Jose) Modified on 1/14/2019 to edit docket text (rom).
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (rim)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Ex-parte MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment filed by Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales on behalf of Seacape Shipping & Trading LLC Responses due by 1/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rivera-Morales, Jose)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint in Admiralty against Metalex 2000 S.A. and Alutrade S.A. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6195873.), filed by Seacape Shipping & Trading LLC. Service due by 3/20/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rivera-Morales, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seacape Shipping & Trading LLC v. Metalex 2000 S.A. and Alutrade S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalex 2000 S.A. and Alutrade S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seacape Shipping & Trading LLC
Represented By: Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?