Allen et al v. TLS Management and Marketing Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Association Insurance Management, Inc. and Elgin Allen
Defendant: TLS Trading and Capital, LLC and TLS Management and Marketing Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01999
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion Opposing Remand filed by Elgin Allen, Association Insurance Management, Inc. Re: #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Elgin Allen, Association Insurance Management, Inc. filed by Elgin Allen, Association Insurance Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Ramos-Cruz, Lydia)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs shall file their surreply as a separate docket entry within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/13/2019. (wm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Dkt. #9 filed by Lydia M. Ramos-Cruz on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Ramos-Cruz, Lydia) Modified on 2/12/2019 to add docket relation (rom).
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Parties are to submit a Joint Proposed Initial Scheduling Memorandum, which must include the parties' theories of the case. The parties are granted until 3/1/2019 to comply. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions. In addition, the parties are granted until 3/1/2019, to state whether they consent to the trial jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/7/2019. (wm)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by TLS Management and Marketing Services, LLC, TLS Trading and Capital, LLC Re: #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Elgin Allen, Association Insurance Management, Inc. filed by TLS Management and Marketing Services, LLC, TLS Trading and Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Unsworn Statement)(Pietrantoni, Manuel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Manuel A. Pietrantoni on behalf of Defendants TLS Management and Marketing Services, LLC, TLS Trading and Capital, LLC.(Pietrantoni, Manuel)
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand filed by Lydia M. Ramos-Cruz on behalf of Elgin Allen, Association Insurance Management, Inc. Responses due by 2/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Ramos-Cruz, Lydia)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants are granted until 1/30/2019, to answer or otherwise plead. Dispositive motions will not be considered in lieu of an answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/16/2019. (wm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 30, 2019. to File Answer OR OTHERWISE MOVE AGAINST THE COMPLAINT re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by TLS Trading and Capital, LLC, TLS Management and Marketing Services, LLC filed by Manuel A. Pietrantoni on behalf of TLS Management and Marketing Services, LLC, TLS Trading and Capital, LLC Responses due by 1/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Pietrantoni, Manuel)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (rim)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet and Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by TLS Trading and Capital, LLC, TLS Management and Marketing Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pietrantoni, Manuel)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 12/27/2018. (rim)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance San Juan, case number Civil No. SJ2018CV09990. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6198819), filed by TLS Trading and Capital, LLC, TLS Management and Marketing Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Pietrantoni, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. TLS Management and Marketing Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLS Trading and Capital, LLC
Represented By: Manuel A. Pietrantoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLS Management and Marketing Services, LLC
Represented By: Manuel A. Pietrantoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association Insurance Management, Inc.
Represented By: Lydia M. Ramos-Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elgin Allen
Represented By: Lydia M. Ramos-Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?