Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC v. BVP Homes, LLC

Plaintiff: Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC
Defendant: BVP Homes, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02017
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Motion filed by BVP Homes, LLC Re: #10 MOTION in Opposition to defendants #1 Notice of Removal filed by Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC filed by BVP Homes, LLC. (Schell-Asad, Richard) Modified on 2/21/2019 to edit docket text (rom).
January 21, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to defendants #1 Notice of Removal filed by Israel Roldan-Gonzalez on behalf of Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC Responses due by 2/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Master Services Agreement)(Roldan-Gonzalez, Israel) Modified on 1/22/2019 to edit docket text (rom).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 28, 2019 to file certified translations of complaint and summons, #3 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 28, 2019 to File Answer its Pleadings. Defendant is granted until 1/28/2019, to file certified translations (ECF No. 2) and its answer to the complaint (ECF No. 3). Dispositive motions will not be considered in lieu of an answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/16/2019.(wm)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for extension of time. Plaintiffs have until 2/1/2019 to file an opposition to defendant's notice of removal. Compliance by 2/1/2019. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/15/2019. (wm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time filed by Israel Roldan-Gonzalez on behalf of Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC Responses due by 1/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Roldan-Gonzalez, Israel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance by All Defendants re #4 Notice of Defective Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) and Category Sheet) (Schell-Asad, Richard)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 1/3/2019. (vdm)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 28, 2019 to File Answer its Pleadings filed by Richard Schell-Asad on behalf of BVP Homes, LLC Responses due by 1/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Schell-Asad, Richard)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 28, 2019 to file certified translations of complaint and summons filed by Richard Schell-Asad on behalf of BVP Homes, LLC Responses due by 1/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Schell-Asad, Richard)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance of Puerto Rico, Bayamn Part, case number VB2018CV00631. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6203023), filed by BVP Homes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint and Summons)(Schell-Asad, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC v. BVP Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BVP Homes, LLC
Represented By: Richard Schell-Asad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?