v. Social Security Administration Office of the Inspector General
Petitioner: Dr. Americo Oms-Rivera
Respondent: Social Security Administration Office of the Inspector General
Case Number: 3:2019cv01015
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 12:3410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Motion to Quash filed by Vanessa D. Bonano-Rodriguez on behalf of Social Security Administration Office of the Inspector General Responses due by 2/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bonano-Rodriguez, Vanessa)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa D. Bonano-Rodriguez on behalf of Social Security Administration Office of the Inspector General (Bonano-Rodriguez, Vanessa)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Government's Subpoena for Bank Records filed by Sonia I. Torres-Pabon on behalf of Americo Oms-Rivera Responses due by 1/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit RFPA Subpoenas, #4 Exhibit Declaration)(Torres-Pabon, Sonia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Social Security Administration Office of the Inspector General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dr. Americo Oms-Rivera
Represented By: Sonia I. Torres-Pabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Social Security Administration Office of the Inspector General
Represented By: Vanessa D. Bonano-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?