Track Group, Inc. v. I.C.S. of the Bahamas Co. LTD.
Plaintiff: Track Group, Inc.
Defendant: I.C.S. OF THE BAHAMAS CO., LTD. and I.C.S. of the Bahamas Co. LTD.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01020
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This case has been transferred to the docket of Judge William G. Young who has consented to said transfer. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 02/01/2019. (gr)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Track Group, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, of Foreign Process (Figueroa-Matos, Reinaldo)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Track Group, Inc. upon I.C.S. of the Bahamas Co. LTD. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (Figueroa-Matos, Reinaldo)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to I.C.S. OF THE BAHAMAS CO., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Vacate Corrected Award against Track Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6211191.), filed by Track Group, Inc.. Service due by 4/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit i, #2 Exhibit ii, #3 Exhibit iii, #4 Exhibit iv, #5 Exhibit v, #6 Exhibit vi, #7 Exhibit vii, #8 Exhibit viii, #9 Exhibit ix, #10 Exhibit x, #11 Category Sheet, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons)(Figueroa-Matos, Reinaldo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Track Group, Inc. v. I.C.S. of the Bahamas Co. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Track Group, Inc.
Represented By: Reinaldo Figueroa-Matos
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C.S. OF THE BAHAMAS CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C.S. of the Bahamas Co. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?