Carbajal-Valdez v. USA
Petitioner: Juan Francisco Emilio Carbajal-Valdez
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01030
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Motion Requesting Order: NOTED. A civil case, 19-1030 has been opened for defendant's motion to vacate his sentence. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/01/2019. (brc)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION requesting Status filed by Juan Francisco Emilio Carbajal-Valdez, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ab)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 15-228-FAB) filed by Juan Francisco Emilio Carbajal-Valdez, Pro Se. Responses due by 2/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ab)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 15-228) filed by Juan Francisco Emilio Carbajal-Valdez, Pro Se. Responses due by 1/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(arg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carbajal-Valdez v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Francisco Emilio Carbajal-Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?