U.S. Bank National Association v. Vazquez-Febles et al
Plaintiff: .S. Bank National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as trustee for the RCAC Pass-Through Trust, Series 2014-PR. and U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: VAZQUEZ-RIVERA CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP, UNITED SATES OF AMERICA, INAIDA RIVERA-MONTALVO, MANUEL VAZQUEZ-FEBLES, Conjugal Partnership Vazquez-Rivera and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01081
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay filed by Juan M. Surillo-Pumarada on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association Responses due by 3/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit notice of bankruptcy filing)(Surillo-Pumarada, Juan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Conjugal Partnership Vazquez-Rivera filed by Juan M. Surillo-Pumarada on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association Responses due by 3/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons summons)(Surillo-Pumarada, Juan)
February 19, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #4 MOTION Submitting summons. ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect Summons. To be re-filed.*** (idg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect Summons. To be re-filed.*** MOTION Submitting summons filed by Juan M. Surillo-Pumarada on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association Responses due by 3/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons summons)(Surillo-Pumarada, Juan) Modified docket text on 3/4/2019 (idg).
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Inaida Rivera-Montalvo, United States of America, Manuel Vazquez-Febles (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6236890.), filed by.S. Bank National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as trustee for the RCAC Pass-Through Trust, Series 2014-PR.. Service due by 4/29/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet category sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #3 Exhibit mortgage deed, #4 Exhibit mortgage note, #5 Exhibit modification deed, #6 Exhibit allonge, #7 Summons summons)(Surillo-Pumarada, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Vazquez-Febles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VAZQUEZ-RIVERA CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED SATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INAIDA RIVERA-MONTALVO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANUEL VAZQUEZ-FEBLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Vazquez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: .S. Bank National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as trustee for the RCAC Pass-Through Trust, Series 2014-PR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Juan M. Surillo-Pumarada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?