Vazquez Santiago v. Edwards Lifesciences Technology Sarl, LLC
Plaintiff: Alberto Vazquez Santiago and Alberto Vazquez-Santiago
Defendant: Edwards Lifesciences Technology Sarl, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01089
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time until 4/17/2019 to Secure Legal Representation filed by Alberto Vazquez-Santiago, pro se. Responses due by 3/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (idg)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations of Exhibits to Notice of Removal filed by Lorimar Barreto-Vincenty on behalf of Edwards Lifesciences Technology Sarl, LLC Responses due by 3/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Barreto-Vincenty, Lorimar)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Israel Fernandez-Rodriguez on behalf of Edwards Lifesciences Technology Sarl, LLC (Fernandez-Rodriguez, Israel)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance as Lead Counsel by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of Edwards Lifesciences Technology Sarl, LLC (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo. (rim)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until February 28, 2019 to file Certified Translations filed by Lorimar Barreto-Vincenty on behalf of Edwards Lifesciences Technology Sarl, LLC Responses due by 2/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Barreto-Vincenty, Lorimar)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Lorimar Barreto-Vincenty on behalf of Defendant Edwards Lifesciences Technology Sarl, LLC.(Barreto-Vincenty, Lorimar)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Aguadilla, case number AG2018CV00049. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6239551), filed by Edwards Lifesciences Technology Sarl, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit II, #5 Exhibit III, #6 Exhibit IV)(Barreto-Vincenty, Lorimar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez Santiago v. Edwards Lifesciences Technology Sarl, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwards Lifesciences Technology Sarl, LLC
Represented By: Lorimar Barreto-Vincenty
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Israel Fernandez-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Vazquez Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Vazquez-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?