Perez-Velez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Jose M. Perez-Velez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01122
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 6), this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-1122 (BJM). Judge Francisco A. Besosa is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 02/08/2019. (ft)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge: NOTED. This case is referred to a magistrate judge for all proceedings, including the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/08/2019. (brc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jose M. Perez-Velez. (De Mier-LeBlanc, Louis)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Social Security Complaint. No later than February 14, 2019, plaintiff will inform the Court if he consents to have a magistrate judge handle this case, to include the entry of judgment. Failure to do so will be considered implicit consent. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/07/2019. (brc)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office, Social Security Administration & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT Jose M. Perez-Velez against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6254995.), filed by Jose M. Perez-Velez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney, San Juan, PR, #4 Summons Office of Attorney General, Washington, DC, #5 Summons Social Security Administration, New York, NY, #6 Summons Commissioner of Social Security, Baltimore, MD)(De Mier-LeBlanc, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Velez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Perez-Velez
Represented By: Louis A. De Mier-LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?