United States of America v. Rodriguez David

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Marlin Rodriguez David
Case Number: 3:2019cv01128
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Marlin Rodriguez David waiver sent on 2/20/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Matos, Jorge)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marlin Rodriguez David, filed by United States of America. Service due by 5/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A: Emails CBP TAU, #4 Exhibit B: DHL Airway Bill, #5 Exhibit C: IPRIS Printout, #6 Exhibit D: SEACATS Incident Report, #7 Exhibit E: Appraisal, #8 Exhibit F: Notice of Seizure, #9 Exhibit G: Declaration of Admin. Forfeiture, #10 Exhibit H: Notice of Penalty, #11 Exhibit I: FP &P Demand Letters, #12 Exhibit J: Request for Extension, #13 Exhibit K: 2nd Request for Extension, #14 Exhibit L: Petition for Relief, #15 Exhibit M: Response to Petition, #16 Exhibit N: Request Extension Supp., #17 Exhibit O: Additional Bill, #18 Exhibit P: ACC Demand Letters)(Matos, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rodriguez David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin Rodriguez David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jorge L. Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?