Carolina Catering Corp. v. Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carolina Catering Corp. d/b/a Sky Caterers and Carolina Catering Corporation
Defendant: Prohibas Inflight Catering, LLC, Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC and Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01130
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1337
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Carolina Catering Corporation Re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC, #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to First Amended Complaint filed by Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. filed by Carolina Catering Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose)
April 5, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jose A. Alvarado-Vazquez on behalf of Carolina Catering Corporation Responses due by 4/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Granting as requested #53 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/5/2019. (AGF)
April 4, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jose A. Alvarado-Vazquez on behalf of Carolina Catering Corporation Responses due by 4/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose)
April 1, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro Hernandez-Freire on behalf of Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. (Hernandez-Freire, Pedro)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss (Docket No. 43) on or before April 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/1/2019. (AGF)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Granting #46 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents; Granting #46 Motion for extension of time. Translations are due on or before April 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/1/2019. (AGF)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Granting #45 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/1/2019. (AGF)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Noted #42 Motion for Joinder Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/1/2019. (AGF)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to the motion at Docket No. #40 on or before April 5, 2019. The court shall expedite ruling as to the same. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/29/2019. (AGF)
March 28, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents Exhibits to Motion at Docket No. 44, MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. Responses due by 4/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos). Added MOTION for extension of time on 3/29/2019 (gmm).
March 28, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. Responses due by 4/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
March 28, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #30 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Carolina Catering Corporation filed by Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Yolanda Prohias in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA)(Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) Modified on 3/29/2019 to edit docket text (gmm).
March 28, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: #28 Amended Complaint filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. Responses due by 4/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) Modified on 3/29/2019 to add docket relationship (gmm).
March 28, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Joinder re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #41 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. Responses due by 4/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #40 , #41 ) (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) Modified on 3/29/2019 to edit docket text (gmm).
March 28, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #30 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement CA-06-16)(Tulier-Vazquez, Suleicka) Modified on 3/29/2019 to edit docket text (gmm).
March 28, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Suleicka Tulier-Vazquez on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC Responses due by 4/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tulier-Vazquez, Suleicka)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Noted #38 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/18/2019. (AGF)
March 17, 2019 Filing 38 Motion In Compliance as to 32 Order,,, filed by Jose A. Alvarado-Vazquez on behalf of Carolina Catering Corporation Responses due by 4/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose)
March 15, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement byCarolina Catering Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Airport Shoppes Corp. for Carolina Catering Corporation.. (Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Granting as follows #33 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ; Granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The response to show cause date was entered in error as March 18, 2019. It should read March 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/12/2019. (AGF)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Noted #34 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/12/2019. (AGF)
March 12, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Joinder Re: #33 MOTION to Amend Show Cause Order re 31 Order, MOTION for Extension of Time until April 1, 2019 to File Response/Reply filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. Responses due by 3/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #33 ) (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) Modified on 3/13/2019 to edit text (gmm).
March 12, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Amend Show Cause Order re 31 Order,, MOTION for Extension of Time until April 1, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #28 Amended Complaint filed by Carolina Catering Corporation, #30 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Carolina Catering Corporation filed by Suleicka Tulier-Vazquez on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC Responses due by 3/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 31 #28 , #30 ) (Tulier-Vazquez, Suleicka)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The parties shall jointly inform the court on or before 3/17/19 whether they consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. If so they may request a particular one(s). Counsel shall explain to their clients that this will expedite the resolution of the case, as well as guarantee dates certain for any hearing(s). It will also be more cost-effective to the parties. As counsel well know, the court's congested and ever increasing criminal docket, plus the fact that there are two judicial vacancies, make it increasingly difficult for any district judge to uninterruptedly attend the matter. If the undersigned has to do so, it would be around back to back criminal trials and other matters. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/12/2019. (AGF)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #30 : Defendants shall show cause on or before the date of answering the Amended Complaint as to why the preliminary injunction in this case should not issue. The show cause motion may also include any Rule 12 request for dismissal. This order should not be interpreted to suggest the court's predisposition to rule one way or the other. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/12/2019. (AGF)
March 11, 2019 Filing 30 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jose A. Alvarado-Vazquez on behalf of Carolina Catering Corporation Responses due by 3/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit # 1- Declaration of J. Algarin, #2 Exhibit # 2 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit # 2 - Part 2, #4 Exhibit # 2 - Part 3, #5 Exhibit # 2 - Part 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order of Preliminary Injunction)(Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose)
March 5, 2019 Filing 29 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carolina Catering Corporation.(Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Granting #25 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/1/2019. (AGF)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Granting #24 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/1/2019. (AGF)
February 28, 2019 Filing 25 Motion to allow Leah Brannon to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6291605) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC Responses due by 3/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
February 28, 2019 Filing 24 Motion to allow Kenneth Reinker to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6291591) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC Responses due by 3/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
February 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Suleicka Tulier-Vazquez on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC (Tulier-Vazquez, Suleicka)
February 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Noted and approved accordingly #20 Motion to clarify. When the amended complaint is filed the Court will issue the corresponding order to show cause. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/26/2019. (AGF)
February 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Clarify Orders at Docket Nos. 6 and 19 filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. Responses due by 3/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Noted #18 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/20/2019. (AGF)
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding service of motion at Docket No. 15 filed by Jose A. Alvarado-Vazquez on behalf of Carolina Catering Corporation Responses due by 3/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting #14 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/20/2019. (AGF)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting #13 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/20/2019. (AGF)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Intention to File Amended Complaint by Carolina Catering Corporation (Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to allow Adam Biegel to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6271955) filed by Nestor Mendez-Gomez on behalf of Carolina Catering Corporation Responses due by 3/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to allow Andrew Tuck to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6271929) filed by Nestor Mendez-Gomez on behalf of Carolina Catering Corporation Responses due by 3/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noted #10 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/12/2019. (AGF)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding service of process filed by Jose A. Alvarado-Vazquez on behalf of Carolina Catering Corporation Responses due by 2/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolina Catering Corporation upon All Defendants. (Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Denying #2 Motion for TRO. The request for TRO is hereby denied. Plaintiffs' shall serve summons and copy of the complaint and motion for preliminary injunction to defendants, as well as copy of this order, no later than Wednesday February 13, 2019, and so inform the court. Defendants shall, on or before February 26, 2019, show cause as to why a preliminary injunction should not be issued. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/11/2019. (AGF)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nestor Mendez-Gomez on behalf of Carolina Catering Corporation (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC, Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 2/11/2019 to correct defendant's name (gmm).
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Jose A. Alvarado-Vazquez on behalf of Carolina Catering Corp. d/b/a Sky Caterers Responses due by 2/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC, Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6259629.), filed by Carolina Catering Corp. d/b/a Sky Caterers. Service due by 5/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Aerostar, #2 Summons Summons Prohias, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet Category Sheet)(Alvarado-Vazquez, Jose) Modified on 2/11/2019 to correct name (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carolina Catering Corp. v. Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Catering Corp. d/b/a Sky Caterers
Represented By: Jose A. Alvarado-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Catering Corporation
Represented By: Jose A. Alvarado-Vazquez
Represented By: Adam J. Biegel
Represented By: Andrew J. Tuck
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prohibas Inflight Catering, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth S. Reinker
Represented By: Leah Brannon
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Represented By: Suleicka Tulier-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prohias Inflight Catering, LLC.
Represented By: Pedro Hernandez-Freire
Represented By: Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?