Burgos Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Gerardo R Burgos Rivera and Gerardo R. Burgos-Rivera
Defendant: Liza A Berryhill and Commisioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01132
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marshal D Morgan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commisioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerardo R. Burgos-Rivera upon Commisioner of Social Security served on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By #8 Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa, this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to U.S. Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-1132(MDM). Judge Besosa is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 02/19/2019. (gr)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to a magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/19/2019. (brc)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gerardo R. Burgos-Rivera. (Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Correct name plainitff and defendant against Commisioner of Social Security, filed by Gerardo R. Burgos-Rivera.(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)
February 17, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT to correct name of defendant against Commisioner of Social Security, filed by Gerardo R. Burgos-Rivera.(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint. No later than February 26, 2019, plaintiff will inform the Court whether he consents to have a magistrate judge handle all proceedings, to include the entry of judgment. Failure to do so will be considered implicit consent. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/12/2019. (brc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorneys Office & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liza A Berryhill ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6260038.), filed by Gerardo R Burgos Rivera. Service due by 5/13/2019, (Attachments: #1 Appearance of Counsel, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgos Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo R Burgos Rivera
Represented By: Ramon H. Rivera-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo R. Burgos-Rivera
Represented By: Ramon H. Rivera-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liza A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commisioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?