Gomez-Quinones v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Reynolfo Gomez-Quinones
Defendant: Liza A Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv01141
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Plaintiff shall, on or before April 25, 2019, inform whether he likewise consents, as per 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Given the undersigned's congested criminal docket, consenting will expedite the resolution of this case, and will not preclude any further judicial review by the U.S. Court of Appeals, if necessary. Plaintiffs' Response due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/11/2019. (JG)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Martorani-Dale, David)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 Amended COMPLAINT Amended against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Reynolfo Gomez-Quinones.(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon) Modified on 2/26/2019 to correct docket title as to Amended Complaint. (mg).
February 25, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk, re: DE #7 ***FILED IN ERROR Incomplete PDF, Counsel to re-file corrected PDF with correct Title as to (Amended Complaint.***. (mg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR Incomplete PDF, Counsel to re-file corrected PDF.*** AMENDED COMPLAINT to correct name of defendant against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Reynolfo Gomez-Quinones.(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon) Modified on 2/25/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reynolfo Gomez-Quinones upon Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/22/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon) Modified on 2/22/2019 to correct dates of service (ab).
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR Incomplete PDF, Counsel to re-file corrected PDF.*** AMENDED COMPLAINT Correct plaintiff and defendant name against Liza A. Berryhill, filed by Reynolfo Gomez-Quinones.(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon) Modified on 2/20/2019 (mg).
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** AMENDED COMPLAINT to correct defedant name against Liza A. Berryhill, filed by Reynolfo Gomez-Quinones.(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon) Modified on 2/20/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office, Social Security Administration & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liza A Berryhill ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6268729.), filed by Reynolfo Gomez-Quinones. Service due by 5/15/2019, (Attachments: #1 Appearance of Counsel, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez-Quinones v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liza A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynolfo Gomez-Quinones
Represented By: Ramon H. Rivera-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?