Perez-Comas v. Amgen Manufacturing Ltd

Plaintiff: Eric N. Pagan-Comas
Defendant: Amgen Manufacturing Ltd
Case Number: 3:2019cv01159
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric N. Pagan-Comas upon Amgen Manufacturing Ltd served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (ab)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amgen Manufacturing Ltd (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amgen Manufacturing Ltd ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6276548.), filed by Eric N Perez-Comas. Service due by 5/21/2019, (Attachments: #1 Appearance of Counsel, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons)(Almodovar-Diaz, Maricarmen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Comas v. Amgen Manufacturing Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen Manufacturing Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric N. Pagan-Comas
Represented By: Maricarmen Almodovar-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?