Marquez-Cedeno v. Correctional Health Services Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Vanessa Marquez-Cedeno
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company and Correctional Health Services Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01161
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Correctional Health Services Corporation filed by Carmen Lucia Rodriguez-Velez on behalf of Correctional Health Services Corporation Responses due by 4/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rodriguez-Velez, Carmen)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer "Motion allowed. Extension until April 13, 2019. No further continuances will be allowed." Answer deadline due by 4/13/2019. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/13/2019. (EES)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION Requesting Extension of Time to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Carmen Lucia Rodriguez-Velez on behalf of Correctional Health Services Corporation (Rodriguez-Velez, Carmen) Modified on 3/8/2019 to edit event and title (gmm).
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (Docket No. 6), with the consent of Judge William G. Young, this case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Young. Signed by Clerk on 02/21/2019. (gr)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The clerk of the court is ordered to transfer the instant case to docket of the Honorable William G. Young, who was graciously consented to the transfer. Judge Dominguez will no longer preside over the case. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 2/21/2019. (MES)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER RE CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/4/2017.(gav)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Correctional Health Services Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rodriguez-Escudero, Emil)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6276764.), filed by Vanessa Marquez-Cedeno. Service due by 5/21/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons CHSC)(Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquez-Cedeno v. Correctional Health Services Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Marquez-Cedeno
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Services Corporation
Represented By: Carmen Lucia Rodriguez-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?