Cancel-Otero v. Dorado Health, Inc.
Plaintiff: DIDDIER CANCEL OTERO and Diddier Cancel-Otero
Defendant: Miguel Ortiz-Bou, DORADO HEALTH, INC., D/B/A MANATI MEDICAL CENTER, John Doe, MOE-FOE CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIPS I-X, Continental Insurance Company, A, B, C INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC., James Roe, E, F, G INSURANCE COMPANIES, MedPro Group and Dorado Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01173
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to MedPro Group (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Diddier Cancel-Otero. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER noted #7 Motion for Leave to Appear ; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; noted #9 Motion for Leave to Appear. Answer deadline due by May 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/5/2019. (MES)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 21, 2019 to File Answer To Complaint filed by Giovanni Picorelli-Ayala on behalf of Continental Insurance Company Responses due by 4/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Picorelli-Ayala, Giovanni)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Giovanni Picorelli-Ayala on behalf of Continental Insurance Company Responses due by 4/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Picorelli-Ayala, Giovanni) Modified on 4/5/2019 event, document is not a motion (gav).
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 21, 2019 to File Answer To Complaint filed by Giovanni Picorelli-Ayala on behalf of Dorado Health, Inc. Responses due by 4/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Picorelli-Ayala, Giovanni)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Giovanni Picorelli-Ayala on behalf of Dorado Health, Inc. Responses due by 4/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Picorelli-Ayala, Giovanni) Modified on 4/5/2019 event, document is not a motion (gav).
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Continental Insurance Company served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; Dorado Health, Inc. served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019; Miguel Ortiz-Bou served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicens, Vanesa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Continental Insurance Company, Dorado Health, Inc., Miguel Ortiz-Bou (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6279283.), filed by DIDDIER CANCEL OTERO. Service due by 5/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Williams-English, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cancel-Otero v. Dorado Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Ortiz-Bou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORADO HEALTH, INC., D/B/A MANATI MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOE-FOE CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIPS I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Giovanni Picorelli-Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A, B, C INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E, F, G INSURANCE COMPANIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedPro Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorado Health, Inc.
Represented By: Giovanni Picorelli-Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIDDIER CANCEL OTERO
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diddier Cancel-Otero
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?