Miro-Rodriguez v. Metrohealth, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mildred Miro Rodriguez and Mildred Miro-Rodriguez
Defendant: Metrohealth, Inc., Metro Pavia Health System, Inc and Metro Pavia Health System, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01177
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED, but extension of time to answer is granted until April 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/26/2019. (brc)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 25, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint filed by Homero Gonzalez-Lopez on behalf of Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. Responses due by 4/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Lopez, Homero)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer to complaint deadline April 24, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/25/2019. (brc)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 24, 2019 to File Answer to Amended Complaint re: #8 Amended Complaint filed by Mildred Miro-Rodriguez filed by Lloyd Isgut-Rivera on behalf of Metrohealth, Inc. Responses due by 4/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Isgut-Rivera, Lloyd)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mildred Miro-Rodriguez upon Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Vargas-Acosta, Nora)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Metrohealth, Inc. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Vargas-Acosta, Nora)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mildred Miro-Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right To Sue Notice)(Vargas-Acosta, Nora)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Metro Pavia Health System, Inc, Metrohealth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Vargas-Acosta, Nora)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint filed by Mildred Miro Rodriguez (Vargas-Acosta, Nora)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint filed by Mildred Miro Rodriguez (Vargas-Acosta, Nora)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 First NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint filed by Mildred Miro Rodriguez (Vargas-Acosta, Nora)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6280619.), filed by Mildred Miro Rodriguez. Service due by 5/23/2019, (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Vargas-Acosta, Nora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miro-Rodriguez v. Metrohealth, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metrohealth, Inc.
Represented By: Lloyd Isgut-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Pavia Health System, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Pavia Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Homero Gonzalez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Miro Rodriguez
Represented By: Nora Vargas-Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Miro-Rodriguez
Represented By: Nora Vargas-Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?