Blue Ocean International Bank LLC v. Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc.

Plaintiff: Blue Ocean International Bank LLC
Defendant: Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01178
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss or for Venue Transfer filed by Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to transfer case filed by Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. filed by Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc.. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Motion for Leave to File: GRANTED. The reply will be filed as a separate document no later than April 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/09/2019. (brc)
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer Venue filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. Responses due by 4/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Reply Memorandum)(Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Blue Ocean International Bank LLC Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to transfer case filed by Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. filed by Blue Ocean International Bank LLC. (Pesquera-Rivera, Frances)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Motion Submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/22/2019. (brc)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Motion to Restrict: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/22/2019. (brc)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION Submitting Restricted Documents re: #11 MOTION to Restrict Document (tendered at Dkt.12) filed by Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc., #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to transfer case filed by Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. Responses due by 4/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Maurizio Manzati, #2 Exhibit Exh. A (Investor Questionnaire), #3 Exhibit Exh. B (Client Mandate))(Related document(s) #11 , #10 ) (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Restrict Document (tendered at Dkt.12) filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. Responses due by 4/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ( Responses due by 4/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.), MOTION to transfer case ( Responses due by 4/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.) filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Notice (Other): NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/12/2019. (brc)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Translation of Complaint and Exhibits Thereto, by Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. re 6 Order,, Set Deadlines, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation of Complaint and Its Exhibits) (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline March 21, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/25/2019. (brc)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents, and Motion for Extension of Time until March 10, 2019: GRANTED. Certified translation of the Complaint is due on March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/25/2019. (brc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 21, 2019 to File Answer or Otherwise Defend, filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. Responses due by 3/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH 28 USC sec. 1446(d), by Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents (Complaint), MOTION for Extension of Time until March 10, 2019 to file certified translation of Complaint filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc. Responses due by 3/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Juan Superior Court, case number SJ2018CV10374. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6280919), filed by Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Ocean International Bank LLC v. Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Ocean International Bank LLC
Represented By: Frances R. Pesquera-Rivera
Represented By: Oreste Ricardo Ramos-Pruetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Eagle Capital Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?