Alfonzo-Zamot et al v. Municipality of Utuado et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn Margolla-Martinez, Edgar De Jesus-Cuevas, Joan Reyes-Santiago, Yolanda Gonzalez-Arroyo, Maria De los Angeles Carrero-Pagan, Jorge Cruz-Seda, Jaudice Antongiorgi-Ramos, Suhail Padro-Perez, Aurora Martinez-Rodriguez, Solibert Guilbe-Marin, Madeline Alfonzo-Zamot, Marilia Ocasio de Leon, Carmen Vazquez-Natal, Jose Soto-Torres, Miguel Toledo del Valle, Luis Viruet-Rodriguez, Gloria Toledo-Guzman, Carmen Mercado-Santiago, Minedi Nieves-Matos, Lydia Marilu Ortiz-Gonzalez, Teresa Medina-Martinez, Lissette Miranda, Evelyn Soria-Reyes, Daisy Gonzalez-Viruet, Guillermo Hernandez-Bermudez, Maria Cotts-Ramos, Yeideliz Reyes-Feliciano, Carmen Reyes-Roman, Luz Toledo-Toledo, Myriam Colon-Hernandez, Maximo Ocasio-Viruet, Carmen E. Mercado-Santiago, Linda Rivera-Gonzalez, Yolanda Mendez-Marengo, Jorge A. Cruz-Seda and Jose L. Soto-Torres
Defendant: Programa Head Start - Utuado, Jane Doe, Ernesto Irizarry-Salva, Conjugal Partnership Between Ernesto Irizarry Salva and Jane Doe, Municipality of Utuado and Conjugal Partnership Irizarry-Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv01209
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 Motion for Extension of Time: GRANTED. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 5/2/2019. (lod)
May 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 15, 2019 to File Answer filed by Pablo Tufino-Soto on behalf of Ernesto Irizarry-Salva Responses due by 5/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tufino-Soto, Pablo)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for extension of time. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 4/30/2019. (lod)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time until May 8, 2019 to Answer the Complaint filed by Jose Martinez-Custodio on behalf of Municipality of Utuado, Programa Head Start - Utuado Responses due by 5/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)(Martinez-Custodio, Jose)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED. Attorney appearance deadline May 1, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/29/2019. (brc)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer due May 1, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/29/2019. (brc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time until May 1, 2019 to appear filed by Jose Martinez-Custodio on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Irizarry-Doe, Ernesto Irizarry-Salva Responses due by 4/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Custodio, Jose) Note on 4/1/2019: Lacking electronic signature (S/) and Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. (ab).
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 1, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Jose Martinez-Custodio on behalf of Municipality of Utuado, Programa Head Start - Utuado Responses due by 4/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Martinez-Custodio, Jose) Modified on 4/1/2019 to edit docket text(ab).
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Irizarry-Doe served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019; Ernesto Irizarry-Salva served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019; Municipality of Utuado served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019; Programa Head Start - Utuado served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service Municipality of Utuado, #2 Summons Proof of Service Programa Head Start Utuado, #3 Summons Proof of Service Ernesto Irirzarry Salva, #4 Summons Proof of Service Conjugal Partnership Irizarry-Doe) (Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael) Modified on 3/27/2019 to correct date of service (ab).
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Irizarry-Doe (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Issuance of Summons: NOTED. The Clerk will issue the summons. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/07/2019. (brc)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Conjugal Partnership Irizarry-Doe filed by Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Conjugal Partnership)(Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jane Doe, Ernesto Irizarry-Salva, Municipality of Utuado, Programa Head Start - Utuado. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (vdm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Diaz-Gonzalez, Nicole)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6301599.), filed by Yeideliz Reyes-Feliciano, Yolanda Gonzalez-Arroyo, Miguel Toledo del Valle, Marilia Ocasio de Leon, Jaudice Antongiorgi-Ramos, Madeline Alfonzo-Zamot, Maximo Ocasio-Viruet, Luis Viruet-Rodriguez, Minedi Nieves-Matos, Gloria Toledo-Guzman, Jose Soto-Torres, Luz Toledo-Toledo, Suhail Padro-Perez, Carmen Mercado-Santiago, Evelyn Soria-Reyes, Guillermo Hernandez-Bermudez, Maria Cotts-Ramos, Evelyn Margolla-Martinez, Carmen Reyes-Roman, Teresa Medina-Martinez, Joan Reyes-Santiago, Carmen Vazquez-Natal, Edgar De Jesus-Cuevas, Maria De los Angeles Carrero-Pagan, Solibert Guilbe-Marin, Aurora Martinez-Rodriguez, Lissette Miranda, Daisy Gonzalez-Viruet, Myriam Colon-Hernandez, Lydia Marilu Ortiz-Gonzalez, Jorge Cruz-Seda. Service due by 6/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons Municipality of Utuado, #4 Summons Summons Programa Head Start - Utuado, #5 Summons Summons Ernesto Irizarry Salv, #6 Summons Summons Jane Doe)(Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfonzo-Zamot et al v. Municipality of Utuado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Margolla-Martinez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar De Jesus-Cuevas
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Reyes-Santiago
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Gonzalez-Arroyo
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De los Angeles Carrero-Pagan
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Cruz-Seda
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaudice Antongiorgi-Ramos
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suhail Padro-Perez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora Martinez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solibert Guilbe-Marin
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Alfonzo-Zamot
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilia Ocasio de Leon
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Vazquez-Natal
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Soto-Torres
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Toledo del Valle
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Viruet-Rodriguez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Toledo-Guzman
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Mercado-Santiago
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minedi Nieves-Matos
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Marilu Ortiz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Medina-Martinez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lissette Miranda
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Soria-Reyes
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Gonzalez-Viruet
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Hernandez-Bermudez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cotts-Ramos
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeideliz Reyes-Feliciano
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Reyes-Roman
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Toledo-Toledo
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myriam Colon-Hernandez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximo Ocasio-Viruet
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen E. Mercado-Santiago
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Rivera-Gonzalez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Mendez-Marengo
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge A. Cruz-Seda
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Soto-Torres
Represented By: Nicole Marie Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Programa Head Start - Utuado
Represented By: Jose Martinez-Custodio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto Irizarry-Salva
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Between Ernesto Irizarry Salva and Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Utuado
Represented By: Jose Martinez-Custodio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Irizarry-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?