Bosques-Cordero v. In White, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sandra E. Bosques-Cordero
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC, John Doe, In White, LLC and XYZ Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01211
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Ignacio Rivera-Cordero on behalf of Defendant In White, LLC.(Rivera-Cordero, Ignacio)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra E. Bosques-Cordero upon In White, LLC served on 3/8/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification), filed by Sandra E. Bosques-Cordero.(Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by Sandra E. Bosques-Cordero.(Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Extension of Time filed by Ignacio Rivera-Cordero on behalf of In White, LLC Responses due by 4/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Cordero, Ignacio)
March 25, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #6 Answer to Complaint. ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (idg)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ignacio Rivera-Cordero on behalf of Defendant In White, LLC.(Rivera-Cordero, Ignacio) Modified to file in error on 3/27/2019 (idg).
March 22, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #5 Summons Returned Executed. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-filed.*** (idg)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-filed.*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon In White, LLC served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis) Modified to file in error on 3/27/2019 (idg).
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to In White, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo. (vdm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil and Cover Sheet; Summons re #1 Complaint filed by Sandra E. Bosques-Cordero (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons) (Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6301775.), filed by Sandra E. Bosques-Cordero. Service due by 6/4/2019,(Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosques-Cordero v. In White, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In White, LLC
Represented By: Ignacio Rivera-Cordero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra E. Bosques-Cordero
Represented By: Amexis J. Bonilla-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?