Luciano-Avellanet v. Clean Ocean Initiative, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Luciano-Avellanet
Defendant: Jane Doe, Corporations X,Y,Z, John Doe, Clean Ocean Initiative, Inc., Copperline Capital Partners, LLC and Insurance Companies A, B, and C
Case Number: 3:2019cv01212
Filed: March 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding the stipulation reached by the parties during the civil hearing held on 3/12/2019. See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/12/2019.(cc)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Civil Hearing held on 3/12/2019. Present: Attorney Ablerto Castaner-Padro for the Plaintiff and Attorney Kenneth Suria-Rivera for the defendants. The Court met with the attorneys in chambers to discuss the case background and pending motions. A stipulation was reached resulting in an Order by the Court which will be entered on the docket today. Furthermore, the Court granted #9 "Motion for Leave to Appear" upon notice that the defendants are served with process. Further Civil Hearing set for 3/19/2019 05:15 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 09:55.Hearing ended at 11:55. (cc)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Clean Ocean Initiative, Inc., Copperline Capital Partners, LLC Responses due by 3/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Finding as moot #1 "Motion to Seal Case." See Order of even date. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/11/2019. (LMR)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Noting and Granting #6 "Motion In Compliance with Order at Docket No. 5 and to Unseal Case." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/11/2019. (LMR)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Motion In Compliance and to Unseal Case as to #5 Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment,, filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of Anthony Luciano-Avellanet Responses due by 3/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #5 ) (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Denying #3 "Emergency Ex-Parte Motion for Attachment and Order of Prohibition to Alienate to Secure Satisfaction of Potential Judgment." A hearing to address this matter is hereby set for 3/12/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Luciano-Avellanet shall serve process upon defendants with copies of all filings in this case (Docket Nos. 1 through 4), and of a copy of this Order on or before tomorrow, March 8, 2019. He shall certify compliance the same day process is served. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/7/2019. (LMR)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III. on behalf of Anthony Luciano-Avellanet Responses due by 3/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mr)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Writ of Attachment filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of Anthony Luciano-Avellanet. Responses due by 3/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Writ)(mr)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Luciano-Avellanet. Service due by 6/5/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(mr)
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal Case Pending Execution of Writ of Attachment filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of Anthony Luciano-Avellanet. Responses due by 3/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luciano-Avellanet v. Clean Ocean Initiative, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations X,Y,Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Ocean Initiative, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copperline Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies A, B, and C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Luciano-Avellanet
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?