Government of Puerto Rico et al v. Panasonic Corporation of North America et al
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Government of Puerto Rico
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America, SHENZHEN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD, LG ELECTRONICS TAIWAN TAIPEI CO., LTD., Philips North America Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc., SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., TIANJIN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., PHILIPS DA AMAZONIA INDUSTRIA ELECTRONICA LTDA, LP DISPLAYS INTERNATIONAL, LTD, Hitachi America, LTD., PHILIPS ELECTRONICS INDUSTRIES (TAIWAN), KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV, SAMSUNG SDI MEXICO SA DE CV, LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC., LG PHILIPS DISPLAYS, LTD., Hitachi Asia, LTD, Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN. BHD., Irico Group, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Doe, MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Toshiba Display Devices (Thailand) Company, LTD, Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Maysia) SDN.BHB., Toshiba Corporation, Corporation XYZ, John Doe, Panasonic Corporation, Jane Doe, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., PT Tosummit Electronic Devices Indonesia, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Beijing-Matsushita Color CRT Company, LTD, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Matsushita Electronic Corporation (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Shenzhen Seg Hitachi Colored Display Devices, LTD and Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01246
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing by Juliet Y. Oh, Esq. on behalf of Tatung Company of America, Inc. (rom)
October 29, 2019 Filing 56 PARTIAL JUDGMENT. The case is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE., as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd without the imposition of costs, interest or attorney's fees. Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2019.(sr)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #52 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Government of Puerto Rico. Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice is Granted. Clerk of Court shall enter partial judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/22/2019.(wm)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re #53 Motion to Withdraw. Granted. Clerk of Court shall update the docket accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/23/2019. (wm)
October 18, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw Aaron S. Rabinowitz, Esq. as Counsel filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Philips North America Corporation Responses due by 11/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
October 10, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics, Co., Ltd. by Government of Puerto Rico (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court. ***STRICKEN AS PER ORDER AT D.E. #51*** (gav)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re #50 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Remand filed by the Government of Puerto Rico. Noted and Granted. ECF No. 25 is stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/30/2019.(wm)
August 5, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Remand by Government of Puerto Rico (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/6/2019. (rom)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/6/2019. (rom)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/6/2019. (rom)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/6/2019. (rom)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/6/2019. (rom)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/6/2019. (rom)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/24/2019. (wm)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/24/2019. (wm)
May 10, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Remand filed by Hitachi America, LTD., LG Electronics USA, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips North America Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Tatung Company of America, Inc. Re: #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Government of Puerto Rico filed by Hitachi America, LTD., LG Electronics USA, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips North America Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Tatung Company of America, Inc.. (Alfonso-Rodriguez, Carmen)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re #38 Motion for extension of time. Granted as requested. No further extensions will be granted absent exigent circumstances. Dispositive motions will not be entertained in lieu of answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/7/2019. (wm)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/3/2019. (wm)
May 2, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for extension of time to file response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Dkt. No. 25) filed by Sarika J. Angulo-Velazquez on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Responses due by 5/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika)
April 30, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Suleicka Tulier-Vazquez on behalf of Philips North America Corporation (Tulier-Vazquez, Suleicka)
April 30, 2019 Filing 36 Motion to allow Aaron Rabinowitz to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6382737) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Philips North America Corporation Responses due by 5/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
April 30, 2019 Filing 35 Motion to allow Erik Koons to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6382712) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Philips North America Corporation Responses due by 5/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
April 30, 2019 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement byPhilips North America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips N.V. for Philips North America Corporation.. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
April 30, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Philips North America Corporation (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
April 26, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 10, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Government of Puerto Rico filed by Carmen M. Alfonso-Rodriguez on behalf of Hitachi America, LTD., LG Electronics USA, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips North America Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc. Responses due by 5/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Alfonso-Rodriguez, Carmen)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER noted #30 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/24/2019. (wm)
April 22, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #3 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Philips North America Corporation, Hitachi America, LTD., Panasonic Corporation of North America, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Philips North America Corporation, Hitachi America, LTD., Panasonic Corporation of North America filed by Carmen M. Alfonso-Rodriguez on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America Responses due by 5/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation to Dkt. 1-6, #2 Exhibit Certified Translation to Dkt. 1-7, #3 Exhibit Certified Translation to Dkt. 1-8, #4 Exhibit Certified Translation to Dkt. 1-9)(Related document(s) #3 , #1 ) (Alfonso-Rodriguez, Carmen)
April 22, 2019 Filing 29 Motion to allow David Yolkut to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100063377) filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America Responses due by 5/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
April 22, 2019 Filing 28 Motion to allow Sofia R. Arguello to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100063377) filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America Responses due by 5/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
April 22, 2019 Filing 27 Motion to allow Jeffrey L. Kessler to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100063377) filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America Responses due by 5/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
April 22, 2019 Filing 26 Motion to allow David L. Yohai to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100063377) filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America Responses due by 5/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
April 17, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Government of Puerto Rico Responses due by 5/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File. No further extensions shall be granted. Non-compliance may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/11/2019. (wm)
April 8, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 22, 2019 to file certified translations filed by Carmen M. Alfonso-Rodriguez on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America Responses due by 4/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alfonso-Rodriguez, Carmen)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #15 Motion for Joinder. Granted as requested. No further extensions will be granted absent exigent circumstances. Dispositive motions will not be entertained in lieu of an answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/8/2019. (wm)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER noted #7 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/1/2019. (wm)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER noted #6 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/1/2019. (wm)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #3 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Granted as requested. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/1/2019. (wm)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #5 Motion for extension of time. Granted as requested. No further extensions will be granted absent exigent circumstances. Dispositive motions will not be entertained in lieu of answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/1/2019. (wm)
March 28, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to allow Avery Masters to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6337924) filed by Jose L. Ramirez-Coll on behalf of Tatung Company of America, Inc. Responses due by 4/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Coll, Jose)
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement byTatung Company of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tatung Company for Tatung Company of America, Inc... (Ramirez-Coll, Jose)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Joinder of Motion for Extension of Time For All Defendants to Plead or Otherwise Defend Re: #5 MOTION for extension of time until 60 days after last Defendant is served to plead or otherwise defend MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days after last Defendant is served to File Answer filed by Philips North America Corporation, Hitachi America, LTD., Panasonic Corporation of North America filed by Luis A. Oliver-Fraticelli on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Responses due by 4/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Oliver-Fraticelli, Luis)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Oliver-Fraticelli, Luis)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis A. Oliver-Fraticelli on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Oliver-Fraticelli, Luis)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement byPanasonic Corporation of North America identifying Corporate Parent Panasonic Corporation for Panasonic Corporation of North America.. (Alfonso-Rodriguez, Carmen)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement byLG Electronics USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LG Electronics, Inc. for LG Electronics USA, Inc... (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to allow Rachel S. Brass to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6331110) filed by Jose L. Ramirez-Coll on behalf of Tatung Company of America, Inc. Responses due by 4/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Coll, Jose)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America (Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Philips North America Corporation, Hitachi America, LTD., Panasonic Corporation of North America filed by Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz on behalf of LG Electronics USA, Inc. Responses due by 4/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Joinder in Removal Re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Philips North America Corporation, Hitachi America, LTD., Panasonic Corporation of North America filed by Jose L. Ramirez-Coll on behalf of Tatung Company of America, Inc. Responses due by 4/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramirez-Coll, Jose)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time until 60 days after last Defendant is served to plead or otherwise defend, MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days after last Defendant is served to File Answer filed by Carmen M. Alfonso-Rodriguez on behalf of Hitachi America, LTD., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips North America Corporation Responses due by 4/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assented-To Motion)(Alfonso-Rodriguez, Carmen)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Carmen M. Alfonso-Rodriguez on behalf of Hitachi America, LTD., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips North America Corporation Responses due by 4/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alfonso-Rodriguez, Carmen)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 USC 1446(d) by Hitachi America, LTD., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips North America Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Notice to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2- Informative Motion filed before State Court) (Alfonso-Rodriguez, Carmen)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Instance Court San Juan Part, case number SJ18-cv-010831. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6320499), filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips North America Corporation, Hitachi America, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons- PNA, #4 Exhibit Summons - Ph NA, #5 Exhibit Summons-HNA, #6 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #7 Exhibit Notice State Court, #8 Exhibit Order State Court, #9 Exhibit Motion for Extension)(Alfonso-Rodriguez, Carmen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government of Puerto Rico et al v. Panasonic Corporation of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Represented By: Carmen M. Alfonso-Rodriguez
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Leany Prieto-Rodriguez
Represented By: Sofia R. Arguello
Represented By: David Yolkut
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHENZHEN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS TAIWAN TAIPEI CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips North America Corporation
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Represented By: Erik Koons
Represented By: Suleicka Tulier-Vazquez
Represented By: Aaron S. Rabinowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIANJIN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS DA AMAZONIA INDUSTRIA ELECTRONICA LTDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LP DISPLAYS INTERNATIONAL, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi America, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS INDUSTRIES (TAIWAN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG SDI MEXICO SA DE CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Represented By: Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG PHILIPS DISPLAYS, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Asia, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN. BHD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irico Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT Picture Display Co., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Display Devices (Thailand) Company, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Maysia) SDN.BHB.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PT Tosummit Electronic Devices Indonesia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beijing-Matsushita Color CRT Company, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: Avery E. Masters
Represented By: Jose L. Ramirez-Coll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matsushita Electronic Corporation (Malaysia) SDN BHD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Seg Hitachi Colored Display Devices, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Represented By: Denise Maldonado-Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?