Scotiabank de Puerto Rico v. First American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Scotiabank de Puerto Rico
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01435
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Scotiabank de Puerto Rico filed by Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo on behalf of Plaintiff Scotiabank de Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Roman-Carrasquillo, Felix)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #7 "Motion for Leave to Appear." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than June 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/12/2019. (EMJ)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement byFirst American Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent First American Financial Corporation for First American Title Insurance Company.. (Roman-Carrasquillo, Felix)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear , MOTION for Extension of Time until June 26, 2019 to File Answer to complaint filed by Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo on behalf of First American Title Insurance Company Responses due by 6/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Roman-Carrasquillo, Felix)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Noting #5 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/30/2019. (EMJ)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding effective service of Defendant filed by Daniel Enrique Matos-Melendez on behalf of Scotiabank de Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Matos-Melendez, Daniel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Enrique Colon-Santana on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Colon-Santana, Jose)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to First American Title Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6390798.), filed by Scotiabank de Puerto Rico. Service due by 8/1/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 3, #7 4, #8 5, #9 6)(Matos-Melendez, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scotiabank de Puerto Rico v. First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotiabank de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Daniel Enrique Matos-Melendez
Represented By: Jose Enrique Colon-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?