Duenas Trailers Rental, Inc. v. Valentin-Collazo et al
Plaintiff: Duenas Trailers Rental, Inc.
Defendant: Alex Valentin-Panell, Esmerald Equipment Reefer, Corp. and Ariel Valentin-Collazo
Case Number: 3:2019cv01438
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Denying #7 Motion requesting Order. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/20/2019. (MET)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION requesting Order Authorizing Service by the United States Marshals Service Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) filed by Javier Micheo-Marcial on behalf of Duenas Trailers Rental, Inc. Responses due by 5/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Micheo-Marcial, Javier)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Dominguez-Victoriano on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dominguez-Victoriano, Maria)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Duenas Trailers Rental, Inc. re #4 Notice of Appearance (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz on behalf of Duenas Trailers Rental, Inc. (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Esmerald Equipment Reefer, Corp., Ariel Valentin-Collazo, Alex Valentin-Panell (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Duenas Trailers Rental, Inc.. Service due by 8/1/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Micheo-Marcial, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duenas Trailers Rental, Inc. v. Valentin-Collazo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Valentin-Panell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esmerald Equipment Reefer, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariel Valentin-Collazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duenas Trailers Rental, Inc.
Represented By: Javier Micheo-Marcial
Represented By: Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz
Represented By: Maria Dominguez-Victoriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?