Mayol-Echevarria v. CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation

Plaintiff: Veronica Mayol-Echevarria
Defendant: CSC PUERTO RICO, LLC; D/B/A DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY OR COMPUTER SCIENCE CORPORATION and CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01444
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Mariel Y. Haack-Pizarro on behalf of Defendant CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation.(Haack-Pizarro, Mariel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Out of Jurisdiction filed by Mariel Y. Haack-Pizarro on behalf of CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation Responses due by 6/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Haack-Pizarro, Mariel)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/07/2019. (lir)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time until July 5, 2019 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Mariel Y. Haack-Pizarro on behalf of CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation Responses due by 6/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Haack-Pizarro, Mariel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin J. Seda-Fernandez on behalf of CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation (Seda-Fernandez, Edwin)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariel Y. Haack-Pizarro on behalf of CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation (Haack-Pizarro, Mariel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Mayol-Echevarria upon CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Roldan-Gonzalez, Israel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 5/10/2019 to replace all caps text. (mg).
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6398577.) re #1 Complaint, filed by Veronica Mayol-Echevarria, filed by Veronica Mayol-Echevarria. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Veronica Mayol-Echevarria.(Roldan-Gonzalez, Israel)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1. CSC Puerto Rico, LLC. COMPLAINT, filed by Veronica Mayol-Echevarria re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 5/10/2019. (arg)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation, filed by Veronica Mayol-Echevarria. Service due by 8/6/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Roldan-Gonzalez, Israel) Modified on 5/10/2019 to replace all caps text. (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayol-Echevarria v. CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Mayol-Echevarria
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSC PUERTO RICO, LLC; D/B/A DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY OR COMPUTER SCIENCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSC Puerto Rico, LLC; D/B/A DXC Technology Company of Computer Science Corporation
Represented By: Edwin J. Seda-Fernandez
Represented By: Mariel Y. Haack-Pizarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?