Autonomous Municipality of San Juan v. Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Plaintiff: Autonomous Municipality of San Juan
Defendant: Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01474
Filed: May 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
2 Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER CONFIRMING DEADLINES re #23 Order, #26 Order. USA's Answer to the complaint due by 8/12/2019. FOMB's Motion to dismiss due by 8/9/2019. The Municipality of San Juan shall have until 8/9/2019 to move for limiteddiscovery as to the issue of the Oversight Board being a federal entity. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein on 07/16/2019.(ct)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein for general pretrial management. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 07/12/2019.(ct)
July 12, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket no. 40), this case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Laura Taylor Swain, who has consented to said transfer. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/2019. (nat)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: As per Local Rule 3A this action is hereby transferred to U.S. District Judge Laura Taylor Swain, who presides over the Commonwealth's Title III case (Case No. 17-bk-3283 (LTS)(D.P.R.). This will advance the fair, efficient, and timely disposition of this action and further the efficient performance of the business of the Court. Judge Swain has agreed to this transfer and this case shall continue under the current case number and docketing. The alternate ground to transfer this action as a related case pursuant to PROMESA 306(d)(3) (Docket No. #16 ) is moot. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/12/2019.(MET)
July 10, 2019 Filing 39 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Reassign this action to the Commonwealth Title III Case filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Re: #36 MOTION to transfer case Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Sec 306 or, in the alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan. (Reynoso, Julissa) Modified on 7/11/2019 to edit title (gmm).
July 10, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Section 306 or, in the Alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Re: #36 MOTION to transfer case Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Sec 306 or, in the alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
July 1, 2019 Filing 37 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Re: #36 MOTION to transfer case Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Sec 306 or, in the alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan. (Reynoso, Julissa)
July 1, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to transfer case Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Sec 306 or, in the alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
June 29, 2019 Filing 35 Transcript of initial scheduling conference held on 06/12/2019, before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. Court Reporter/Transcriber Evilys E. Carrion, Evilys_Carrion@prd.uscourts.gov. Telephone number 787.772.3377. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2019. (eec)
June 28, 2019 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico for proceedings held on 6/12/2019 before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi.. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan for proceedings held on June 12, 2019 before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi.. (Fernandez, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Granting #31 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/27/2019. (LE)
June 26, 2019 Filing 31 Motion to allow Martin J. Bienenstock to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6472644) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
June 14, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan re #26 Order, #1 Complaint, #24 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Constitutional Challenge, (Reynoso, Julissa)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Noted #27 Informative Motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/13/2019. (LE)
June 13, 2019 Filing 27 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Standing Order filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 6/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER certifying constitutional challenge. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/13/2019. (LE) (Main Document 26 replaced on 6/13/2019 as per Chamber's request to correct case number in page #2) (gmm).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Noted #24 Informative Motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/13/2019. (LE)
June 12, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi:Initial Scheduling Conference held on 6/12/2019. Counsel of record were present. Arguments heard. Order regarding briefing schedule to be issued. (Court Reporter Evilys Carrion.) (sc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Constitutional Challenge, filed by Julissa Reynoso on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 6/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Notice of Constitutional Challenge to Federal Statute, #2 Attachment B - [Proposed] Order Certifying Constitutional Challenge)(Reynoso, Julissa)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/12/2019. (LE)
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting #20 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/10/2019. (LE)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to allow Guy Brenner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6446715) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. The Court hereby informs both parties that at the upcoming Initial Scheduling Conference (see Docket No. 8) only one attorney per side will be allowed to address the Court. In addition, the parties are hereby ordered to confer, either in person or telephonically, prior to the conference, and attempt to agree to a consensus to fast track schedule and deadlines. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/10/2019.(LE) Modified on 6/11/2019 to add docket text. (gmm).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting #10 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #11 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #12 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #13 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #14 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #15 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #17 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/10/2019. (LE)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to allow Lucy C. Wolf to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6446347) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan re #13 Motion to allow Julissa Reynoso to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445446), #10 Motion to allow Marcelo Blackburn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445375), #12 Motion to allow Michael Fernandez to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445443), #14 Motion to allow Aldo Badini to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445452), #11 Motion to allow Leandro Delgado to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445429) (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to allow Hadassa R. Waxman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445182) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #9 Motion to allow Hadassa R. Waxman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445182). ***FILED IN ERROR. Missing Local Counsel's electronic signature. Counsel to re-file.*** (gmm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to allow Aldo Badini to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445452) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to allow Julissa Reynoso to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445446) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to allow Michael Fernandez to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445443) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to allow Leandro Delgado to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445429) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to allow Marcelo Blackburn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445375) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR-MISSING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE*** Motion to allow Hadassa R. Waxman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445182) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 6/10/2019 (gmm).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: An initial scheduling conference is hereby set for Wednesday, June 12, 2019 at 3:30 pm inCourtroom 6 of the Jose V. Toledo Courthouse in Old San Juan. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/10/2019.(LE)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #6 Order of Recusal entered by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez, this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 06/07/2019. (ft)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. See attached. The Clerk will assign the case to another United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/7/2019.(LMR)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint, filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
May 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6411708.), filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan. Service due by 8/19/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mariani-Franco, Raul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autonomous Municipality of San Juan v. Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Represented By: Daniel Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Hadassa R. Waxman
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Lucy C. Wolf
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autonomous Municipality of San Juan
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Represented By: Leandro F. Delgado
Represented By: Julissa Reynoso
Represented By: Michael A. Fernandez
Represented By: Marcelo M. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?