Echevarria v. Trinity Services Group Inc.
Plaintiff: Frank Charles Echevarria
Defendant: Trinity Services Group Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01476
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Referring Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: Atty. Grace M. Figueroa-Irizarry appointed to represent defendant Frank Charles Echevarria. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appointment of Counsel in the Spanish Language)(gmm)Notice of Manual Notification re #6 Order sent to via regular mail to Atty. Grace M. Figueroa-Irizarry and Frank Charles Echevarria.
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall appoint counsel forthwith. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 5/29/2019.(VCC)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This case is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll for appointment of pro bono counsel. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 19-1476. (AGF)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Trinity Services Group Inc., filed by Frank Charles Echevarria, Pro Se. Service due by 8/19/2019, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ad)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Frank Charles Echevarria, Pro Se. (ad)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frank Charles Echevarria, Pro Se. Responses due by 6/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echevarria v. Trinity Services Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Services Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Charles Echevarria
Represented By: Grace M. Figueroa-Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?