Alcantara-Mendez v. USA
Petitioner: Enoc Alcantara-Mendez
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01482
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by USA Re: #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 03-cr-018-FAB) filed by Enoc Alcantara-Mendez filed by USA. (Bauza, Mariana) Modified on 7/16/2019 to correct title (xi).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255): GRANTED. Response to motion due July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/09/2019. (brc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 8, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 03-cr-018-FAB) filed by Enoc Alcantara-Mendez filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 7/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bauza, Mariana)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: GRANTED. Replies due July 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/07/2019. (brc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/08/2019 to File Response/Reply filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 6/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255): The government will respond to this motion no later than June 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 5/22/2019.(ab)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 03-cr-018-FAB) filed by Enoc Alcantara-Mendez, Pro Se. Responses due by 6/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcantara-Mendez v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Enoc Alcantara-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?