Condado 3 CFL, LLC. v. Gonzalez-Gonzalez

Plaintiff: Condado 3 CFL, LLC.
Defendant: Sonia Gonzalez Gonzalez and Sonia Gonzalez-Gonzalez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01485
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Original Complaint by Condado 3 CFL, LLC. upon Sonia Gonzalez-Gonzalez served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Roman-Sanchez, Cynthia)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sonia Gonzalez-Gonzalez, filed by Condado 3 CFL, LLC..(Roman-Sanchez, Cynthia)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sonia Gonzalez Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (ad)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sonia Gonzalez Gonzalez ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6417972.), filed by Condado 3 CFL, LLC.. Service due by 8/20/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit #1, #4 Summons Summons)(Roman-Sanchez, Cynthia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Condado 3 CFL, LLC. v. Gonzalez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Gonzalez Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Gonzalez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Condado 3 CFL, LLC.
Represented By: Cynthia Roman-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?