Lopez-Diaz v. Joyner

Petitioner: Jose Lopez-Diaz
Respondent: H. Joyner
Case Number: 3:2019cv01490
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 2:18-cv-03135. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Jose Lopez-Diaz. (hada, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/23/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Lopez-Diaz's response deadline has expired, and the Court has not received anything from Lopez-Diaz. The Court hereby recharacterizes his petition as a 2255 motion. Such motions are to be filed with the sentencing court, not the court where the prisoner is confined. See 2255(a). Therefore, this motion shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 05/14/2019. (hada, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/23/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Order with required documents, 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, placed in U.S. Mail to Jose Lopez-Diaz. (hada, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/23/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REFERENCE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 04/04/2019.(hada, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/23/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Court will allow Lopez-Diaz thirty days to withdraw or amend his petition, or he may provide written objections to recharacterization and request that his petition be ruled on the merits as filed. If no withdrawal or amendment is received after thirty days, this Court will construe Lopez-Diaz's petition as a 2255 motion and transfer the motion to the sentencing court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 04/04/2019. (hada, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/23/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jose Lopez Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope) Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker. (hada, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/23/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #3 Proper Form Order with required documents, placed in U.S. Mail to Jose Lopez-Diaz. (hada, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/23/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 4/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 03/20/2019. (hada, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/23/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jose Lopez Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (hada, ) Modified filing date on 11/20/2018 (hada, ). [Transferred from scd on 5/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez-Diaz v. Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H. Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Lopez-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?