United States of America v. Vernet Inc.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Vernet Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01494
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT JUDGMENT Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/3/2019.(EES)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/3/2019. (EES)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Jorge L. Matos on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 6/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Jugment)(Matos, Jorge)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vernet Inc., filed by United States of America. Service due by 8/21/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A Settlement Agreement)(Matos, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Vernet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jorge L. Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?