Medina-Carmona v. XLD Investments (PR) LLC et al

Plaintiff: Luz Medina Carmona and Luz Medina-Carmona
Defendant: XLD Investments (PR) LLC d/b/a SJ Marriott Resort & Stellaris Casino, Marriott PR Management Corp. d/b/a SJ Marriott Resort & Stellaris Casino, XLD Investments (Puerto Rico) LLC and Marriott PR Management Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01502
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 2, 2019 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of XLD Investments (Puerto Rico) LLC Responses due by 8/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Defendant Marriott PR Management Corp..(Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Marriott PR Management Corp. Responses due by 8/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 7/19/2019. Dispositive motions will not be entertained in lieu of answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/17/2019. (wm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 19, 2019 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Marriott PR Management Corp. Responses due by 7/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luz Medina-Carmona upon XLD Investments (Puerto Rico) LLC served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luz Medina-Carmona upon Marriott PR Management Corp. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Jose L. Rivero-Vergne on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rivero-Vergne, Jose) Modified on 5/30/2019 to edit event (rom).
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marriott PR Management Corp. d/b/a SJ Marriott Resort & Stellaris Casino, XLD Investments (PR) LLC d/b/a SJ Marriott Resort & Stellaris Casino (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6422749.), filed by Luz Medina Carmona. Service due by 8/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Marriott PR Management Corp. d/b/a SJ Marriott Resort & Stellaris Casino, #4 Summons XLD Investments (PR), LLC d/b/a SJ Marriott Resort & Stellaris Casino)(Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina-Carmona v. XLD Investments (PR) LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XLD Investments (PR) LLC d/b/a SJ Marriott Resort & Stellaris Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott PR Management Corp. d/b/a SJ Marriott Resort & Stellaris Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XLD Investments (Puerto Rico) LLC
Represented By: Ivy Mercado-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott PR Management Corp.
Represented By: Ivy Mercado-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Medina Carmona
Represented By: Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Medina-Carmona
Represented By: Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz
Represented By: Jose L. Rivero-Vergne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?