Ramirez v. Wyndham Grand Rio Mar Puerto Rico Golf & Beach Resort et al

Plaintiff: Jorge A Ramirez and Jorge Antonio Ramirez
Defendant: ABC Corporations, ABC Advertising Company, John Doe, WYNDHAM GRAND RESORT RIO MAR, XYZ Insurance Companies, Jane Doe and Wyndham Grand Rio Mar Puerto Rico Golf & Beach Resort
Case Number: 3:2019cv01506
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/18/2019 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Wyndham Grand Rio Mar Puerto Rico Golf & Beach Resort Responses due by 8/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time until July 22,2019 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Wyndham Grand Rio Mar Puerto Rico Golf & Beach Resort Responses due by 7/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification), filed by Jorge Antonio Ramirez.(Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wyndham Grand Rio Mar Puerto Rico Golf & Beach Resort (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6423252.), filed by Jorge A Ramirez. Service due by 8/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Wyndham Grand Rio Mar Puerto Rico Golf & Beach Resort et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Advertising Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYNDHAM GRAND RESORT RIO MAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Grand Rio Mar Puerto Rico Golf & Beach Resort
Represented By: Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge A Ramirez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Antonio Ramirez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?