Irizarry-Luna v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Brenda Irizarry-Luna
Defendant: united states of america
Case Number: 3:2019cv01515
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Lack of ServiceSeptember 7, 2019, MOTION for Extension of Time until Lack of ServiceSeptember 7, 2019 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Brenda Irizarry-Luna filed by Rafael J. Lopez-Rivera on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 8/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Lopez-Rivera, Rafael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael J. Lopez-Rivera on behalf of United States of America (Lopez-Rivera, Rafael)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against united states of america ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6425795.), filed by Brenda Irizarry-Luna. Service due by 8/26/2019, (Attachments: #1 Summons 1 Summons, #2 Exhibit Initializing Documents)(Schell-Asad, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irizarry-Luna v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Irizarry-Luna
Represented By: Richard Schell-Asad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: united states of america
Represented By: Rafael J. Lopez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?