Figueroa-Ibarry v. Rennick et al
Plaintiff: Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry
Defendant: Kevin B. Rennick and Mark T. Esper
Case Number: 3:2019cv01541
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion submitting Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/18/2019. (EES)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Submitting Affidavit of Service filed by Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry, Pro se. Responses due by 7/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(gav)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mark T. Esper, Kevin B. Rennick (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/5/2019. (EES)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/5/2019. (EES)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry, Pro se. Responses due by 6/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(gav)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry, Pro se. Responses due by 6/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark T. Esper, Kevin B. Rennick, filed by Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry, Pro se. Service due by 9/3/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 EEOC Reconsideration, #5 EEOC Decision, #6 Brief in Support of Appeal)(gav)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueroa-Ibarry v. Rennick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin B. Rennick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?