Nunez-Perez v. Rolon-Suarez et al

Plaintiff: David Nunez-Perez
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Erik Rolon-Suarez and Hector Hernandez-Morales
Case Number: 3:2019cv01555
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Nunez-Perez upon Commonwealth of Puerto Rico served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; Erik Rolon-Suarez served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (gav)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 USM Return of Summons Executed as to Erik Rolon-Suarez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico on 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (gav) Modified on 7/24/2019 add party (gav).
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Hector Hernandez-Morales, Erik Rolon-Suarez to be served through the U.S. Marshal with copy of Order, Complaint and USM 285. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim) Modified on 7/18/2019 add text (gav).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Nunez-Perez."The Clerk shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the summons, complaint, and this order upon defendant(s) as directed by plaintiff with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/11/2019.(EES)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/11/2019. (EES)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Nunez-Perez, Pro se. Responses due by 7/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement, #2 Envelope)(gav)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Erik Rolon-Suarez and Hector Hernandez-Morales filed by David Nunez-Perez, Pro Se. Service due by 9/5/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(rim) Modified on 6/7/2019 add text (gav).
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees does not comply with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1915 and L.Civ.Rs. 3.1 (a), (b)(2) and (c)(4). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 7/5/2019.(rim)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Nunez-Perez, Pro Se. Responses due by 6/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (rim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez-Perez v. Rolon-Suarez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Rolon-Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Hernandez-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Nunez-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?